Fari Holdings, Ltd v. Info-Drive Software, Inc.

Defendant: Info-Drive Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fari Holdings, Ltd
Case Number: 5:2013cv02053
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO COURT-SPONSORED MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 17, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
October 28, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief; striking Plaintiff's demand for punitive and exemplary damages (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
December 20, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd conditionally granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Papers may continue to be served on Kelley Drye for forwarding purposes, unless and until Info-Drive appears by other counsel. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 27, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/27/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fari Holdings, Ltd v. Info-Drive Software, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Info-Drive Software, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Fink
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fari Holdings, Ltd
Represented By: Jared Matthew Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]