Chunghwa Telecom Global, Inc v. Medcom, LLC et al

Defendant: Chris Sanders, David Cooper, QT Talk, Inc, Medcom, LLC and Does 1-50 inclusive
Plaintiff: Chunghwa Telecom Global, Inc
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02104
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
July 2, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 2, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 9, 2013 26 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) extending time for plaintiff to oppose defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's opposition due 7/12/2013. Defendants' reply due 8/2/2013. Motion hearing set for 8/20/2013, 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/9/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
October 16, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 10 defendants' Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Amended complaint to be filed within 14 days from the date of this order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
December 3, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Request re Settlement Conference and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Parties referred to Magistrate Judge Grewal for settlement conference to take place within 90 days from the date of this order. Defendants' response to complaint due no later than 20 days after settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/3/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chunghwa Telecom Global, Inc v. Medcom, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Sanders
Represented By: Michael Fishman
Represented By: Helen Lee Greenberg
Represented By: Michael Steven Romeo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cooper
Represented By: Michael Fishman
Represented By: Helen Lee Greenberg
Represented By: Michael Steven Romeo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QT Talk, Inc
Represented By: Michael Steven Romeo
Represented By: Helen Lee Greenberg
Represented By: Michael Fishman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medcom, LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Romeo
Represented By: Helen Lee Greenberg
Represented By: Michael Fishman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chunghwa Telecom Global, Inc
Represented By: Nelson Hsieh
Represented By: Yen Phi Chau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]