MacGregor v. Martin et al

Defendant: R.N. Yan, M.D. Martin, M.D. Dial and G.W. James
Plaintiff: Kevin A. MacGregor
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02309
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Provide Court with More Information for Defendants. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
February 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Denying 15 , 20 Motion to Stay Pending Appointment of Counsel; Denying 17 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Motion to Stay Proceedings by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
August 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Dispositive Motion due by 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MacGregor v. Martin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Yan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Dial
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.W. James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. MacGregor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]