Phonak, LLC v. Park Avenue Acoustics, Inc.,

Defendant: Park Avenue Acoustics, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Phonak, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv02922
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 4, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
January 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE. This action is STAYED in favor of Defendant's bankruptcy proceedings as to all claims asserted against Defendant until further order of the court. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. The court schedules this action for a Status Conference on 5/30/2014 at 10:00 a.m. On or before 5/23/2014, the parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which provides an update as to Defendant's bankruptcy proceeding and any adversarial proceeding between the parties. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/29/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
May 27, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 9/19/2014. Status Conference set for 9/26/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***5/30/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated AS MOOT: 36 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference filed by Phonak, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/27/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
September 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or for failure to comply with a court order. If Plaintiff does not, by 9/29/2014, file a Joint Status Conference Statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Status Conference scheduled for 9/26/2014, is VACATED and will be reset by the court if necessary. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 26, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On September 24, 2014, the court issued an Order to Show Cause requiring Plaintiff to file a Joint Status Conference Statement on or before September 29, 2014, after the parties failed to file the statement by the original deadline imposed by the court. See Docket Item No. 38. Plaintiff has since complied as directed. Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. In place of a continued Status Conference, the parties shall, within 10 days of the completion of Defendant's bankruptcy proceeding, file a stipulation and proposed order notifying the court ofsuch development and requesting the court schedule this case for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/26/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phonak, LLC v. Park Avenue Acoustics, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Avenue Acoustics, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert Stephen Besser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phonak, LLC
Represented By: Richard Keith Howell
Represented By: Kathryn Diane Zajec Domin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]