Dong v. Various, Inc. et al

Defendant: FriendFinder Networks Inc., Various, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Plaintiff: Quy Dong
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02992
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. Accordingly, this action is STAYED in favor of Defendants' bankruptcy proceedings as to all claims asserted against Defendants until further order of the court. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELYCLOSE this file. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***10/18/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 19, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. Accordingly, this action is STAYED in favor of Defendants' bankruptcy proceedings as to all claims asserted against Defendants until further order of the court. The clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***10/18/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/18/2013. (Correction of 17 ). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
December 10, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
May 6, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( 27 ) Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, 280 South First Street San Jose, CA 95113. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 05/06/2014. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 29, 2014 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 29 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 is CONTINUED to 6/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dong v. Various, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FriendFinder Networks Inc.
Represented By: Catherine M. Dacre
Represented By: Emily Eschenbach Barker
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Represented By: Catherine M. Dacre
Represented By: Emily Eschenbach Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quy Dong
Represented By: Sonya Lisa Smallets
Represented By: Aaron Paul Minnis
Represented By: Sean McHenry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]