Lothian v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Janet Lothian
Case Number: 5:2013cv02997
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CONSENT/DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court orders Defendant to file a similar document indicating either its consent or declination to proceed before a Magistrate Judge on or before 11/27/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 21, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. As all parties have consented to the assignment of this case to a magistrate judge, the Clerk shall reassign it to an available magistrate judge according to the relevant portions of this District's assignment plan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
January 7, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 For Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/7/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
September 24, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 19 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lothian v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lothian
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]