Netgear, Inc. v. Asustek Computer, Inc. et al

Defendant: Asus Computer International, Inc., Asustek Computer, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Plaintiff: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv03405
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
December 12, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 19 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
January 28, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/27/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/14 is continued to 4/25/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/28/14., Motions terminated: 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Netgear, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/28/14. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
August 1, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/31/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netgear, Inc. v. Asustek Computer, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie L Arbaugh
Represented By: John Michael Gaddis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie L Arbaugh
Represented By: John Michael Gaddis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Leigh Geist
Represented By: Fletcher C. Alford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]