Fink et al v. Altare Publishing Inc, et al

Defendant: Kristen Sara Kowalski, Ryan Dennis Kowalski, DiCarlo Coaching, LLC, DiCarlo Coaching, Vin DiCarlo II Incorporated, Vin DiCarlo Inc., Altare Publishing Inc,, Gerald M. Gresko, Judith A. Gresko, Namecheap, Inc., Donald G. McAllister, Sherry McAllister and Does 1-100
Plaintiff: Auria Styles, Cathy Riley, Kristina Kirby, Angela Kim Bridges, Serene Pritchett, Steve Falls, Daniel Barrett, Mario Osoteo, Jamie Carper, Julianna Hengfoss, Jesse Brister, Mildred Green, Ken Green, George Moreland and Joel Fink
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv03720
Filed: August 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re Sherry McAllister filed by Mario Osoteo, Kristina Kirby, Ken Green, Mildred Green, Julianna Hengfoss, Jesse Brister, Daniel Barrett, Auria Styles, George Moreland, Steve Falls, Joel Fink, Angela Kim Bridges, Serene Pritchett, Jamie Carper, Cathy Riley. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re Donald McAllister filed by Mario Osoteo, Kristina Kirby, Ken Green, Mildred Green, Julianna Hengfoss, Jesse Brister, Daniel Barrett, Auria Styles, George Moreland, Steve Falls, Joel Fink, Angela Kim Bridges, Serene Pritchett, Jamie Carper, Cathy Riley. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
December 3, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement, the court has determined that a Case Management Conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference is VACATED The Court will reset the conference if necessary upon resolution of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/3/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
January 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Remand; denying 33 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 9 Motion to Dismiss. The hearings scheduled for 1/31/2014 are VACATED. The clerk shall remand this action to Santa Clara County Superior Court and close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/28/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fink et al v. Altare Publishing Inc, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Sara Kowalski
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dennis Kowalski
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiCarlo Coaching, LLC
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiCarlo Coaching
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vin DiCarlo II Incorporated
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vin DiCarlo Inc.
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altare Publishing Inc,
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald M. Gresko
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Gresko
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namecheap, Inc.
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald G. McAllister
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry McAllister
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auria Styles
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Riley
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Kirby
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kim Bridges
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serene Pritchett
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Falls
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Barrett
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Osoteo
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Carper
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Hengfoss
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Brister
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Green
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Green
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Moreland
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Fink
Represented By: Timothy James Walton
Represented By: Jimmie Chin Twu
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]