Cypress Semiconductor Corporation v. LG Electronics Inc. Et Al

Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv04034
Filed: August 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/8/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 29, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/28/2014 GRANTING DEFENDANTS 91 MOTION TO STAY PENDING DETERMINATION OF PETITIONS FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
November 14, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 30 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 18, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 35 Stipulation Regarding Scheduling of Case Management Conference (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Steven Lieberman (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael Jones (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jenny Colgate. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
December 19, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joo Mee Kim (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
March 11, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 66 Stipulation re 62 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Patent Local Rule 3 Disclosures and Motion to Stay Proceedings. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
April 2, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong signed 4/1/2014 Granting 73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jason Shapiro (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 21, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/18/2014. (denying 58 , 62 ). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 29, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/25/2014 Granting 80 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
May 27, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/23/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
September 2, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 94 Stipulation Modifying Claim Construction Briefing Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation v. LG Electronics Inc. Et Al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Represented By: Robert Stephen Magee
Represented By: Robert R. Laurenzi
Represented By: Marisa Armanino Williams
Represented By: Terence Paul Woodsome
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]