Jimenez et al v. Suntrust Mortgage Inc.

Plaintiff: Margarito Jimenez and Efren Jimenez
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv04615
Filed: October 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiffs do not, by 2/10/2014, file a Case Management Conference Statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. In light of this order, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 2/7/2014, is VACATED and will be reset by the court if necessary. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 11, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant and the Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/11/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 11, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jimenez et al v. Suntrust Mortgage Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito Jimenez
Represented By: Lauro Nick Pacheco, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Jimenez
Represented By: Lauro Nick Pacheco, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ramos Yap
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]