Halpain v. Adobe Systems Inc.

Defendant: Adobe Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: Christina Halpain and Joseph Kar
3rd_party_plaintiff: Alan Heimlich and Anne McGlynn
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv05226
Filed: November 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Relate Case. Case numbers 13-cv-05596 and 13-cv-05611 are related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
January 30, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (23) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:13-cv-05226-LHK. Cases 14-cv-00014,14-cv-00030 and 14-cv-00157 are related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
September 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 8, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEPTEMBER 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/8/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 9, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/9/2014. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Halpain v. Adobe Systems Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Lena Chanin
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Chernof
Represented By: Angel A. Garganta
Represented By: Ronald Derek Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Halpain
Represented By: Caitlyn D Finley
Represented By: Matthew Brian George
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kar
Represented By: Shehnaz M. Bhujwala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Alan Heimlich
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Anne McGlynn
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]