San Jose Options, Inc.-v-Ho Chung Yeh

Defendant: Ho Chung Yeh
Plaintiff: San Jose Options, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv00500
Filed: January 31, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ANDRES QUINTANA PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/14/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
May 7, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 8 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 22, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/22/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion to Appear by Telephone, filed by San Jose Options, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/18/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 28, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Request to Appear by Telephone, filed by Ho Chung Yeh. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/28/2014. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
September 4, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: San Jose Options, Inc.-v-Ho Chung Yeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho Chung Yeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jose Options, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dake Metzger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]