Vladislav Dincyn v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Vladislav Dincyn
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv01562
Filed: April 4, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The Court has determined that a conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the 8/8/2014 Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
September 30, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, the court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or for failure to comply with a court order. If Plaintiff does not, by October 14, 2014, file or cau se to be filed a Joint Case Management Conference Statement or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No h earing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. In light of this order, the Case Management Conference scheduled for October 3, 2014, is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the issue discussed herein. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
October 21, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 11/7/2014. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines an d hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. The Order to Show Cause issued on September 30, 2014 (Docket Item No. 14) is DISCHARGED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/21/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vladislav Dincyn v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Francis Jude Torrence
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladislav Dincyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]