Mlnarik et al v. Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP et al
Plaintiff: |
John Mlnarik and Kristen Mlnarik |
Defendant: |
Deer Creek Villas Homeowners Association, Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP and D.C. HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION aka DC HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv01849 |
Filed: |
April 22, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Beth Labson Freeman |
Presiding Judge: |
Howard R. Lloyd |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
33
JUDGMENT. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/21/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
31
ORDER SUBMITTING MOTION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; AND VACATING HEARING re 20 . Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 1/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 11/14/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
14
ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint With Leave to Amend. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/28/2014.(blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER Submitting 10 Motion to Dismiss Without Oral Argument and Vacating Hearing Date. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/21/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Mlnarik et al v. Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deer Creek Villas Homeowners Association |
Represented By: |
Austin Pillsbury Nagel |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Smith, Gardner, Slusky, Lazer, Pohren & Rogers, LLP |
Represented By: |
Austin Pillsbury Nagel |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: D.C. HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION aka DC HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: John Mlnarik |
Represented By: |
James Thomas Erickson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Kristen Mlnarik |
Represented By: |
James Thomas Erickson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?