Apple Inc. v. WI-LAN Inc., et al Featured Case

Defendant: Open Network Solutions, Inc. and WI-LAN Inc.
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv02838
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2014 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 20, 2014 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 8 Summons Issued as to Open Network Solutions, Inc., WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 wi-lan summons)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 19, 2014 6 Proposed Summons. (Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 5 Proposed Summons. (Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against WI-LAN Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8709033.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarsi, Mark) (Filed on 6/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. WI-LAN Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Network Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah R Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WI-LAN Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Mark Christopher Scarsi(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Miguel Jesus Ruiz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]