Direct Marketing Association v. Huber Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee: DIRECT MARKETING ASSOCIATION
Defendant - Appellant: ROXY HUBER, in her capacity as Executive Director, Colorado Department of Revenue
Case Number: 11-1082
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2011 15 [9852687] Mandate issued.
March 28, 2011 14 [9852685] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action.
March 28, 2011 [9852680] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting stipulation to dismiss case. Text only entry see order for case termination.
March 25, 2011 12 [9852350] Stipulation to dismiss case filed by Mr. Jack M. Wesoky for Roxy Huber. Served on 03/25/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. JMW
March 23, 2011 11 [9851397] Transcript order form filed by Suzanne Claar. Transcript (oral argument 1/13/11) is due on 05/23/2011 for Suzanne Claar.
March 11, 2011 10 [9848059] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Stephanie Lindquist Scoville and Mr. Jack M. Wesoky for Roxy Huber. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA
March 11, 2011 [9848054] Notice of appearance submitted by Jack M. Wesoky and Stephanie Lindquist Scoville Melanie J. Snyder for Appellant Roxy Huber for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA.--[Edited 03/11/2011 by KF. PDF removed from the entry. The pleading is filed on 3/11/11 by KF] JMW
March 11, 2011 [9848053] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 03/25/2011 for Suzanne Claar. (Text Only - No Attachment) Transcript requested: Oral Argument 1/13/11.
March 11, 2011 7 [9848046] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Roxy Huber. Transcript ordered: Oral Argument, 01/13/11. Served on: 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. JMW
March 11, 2011 6 [9848044] Docketing statement filed by Roxy Huber. Served on 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA. JMW
March 11, 2011 5 [9848013] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. George S. Isaacson and Mr. Matthew Peter Schaefer for Direct Marketing Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: ECF/NDA.
March 11, 2011 4 [9847919] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Matthew Peter Schaefer for Direct Marketing Association. MPS
March 11, 2011 [9847752] Notice of appearance submitted by George S. Isaacson Matthew P. Schaefer for Appellee Direct Marketing Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/11/2011. Manner of Service: email, ECF/NDA.--[Edited 03/11/2011 by JM to remove pdf entry filed by the court on 3/11/11.] GSI
March 1, 2011 [9844477] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 03/01/2011.
February 28, 2011 1 [9844034] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/28/2011. Fee is due by 03/14/2011 for Roxy Huber. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 03/14/2011 for Roxy Huber. Notice of appearance due on 03/14/2011 for Direct Marketing Association.
Search for this case: Direct Marketing Association v. Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: DIRECT MARKETING ASSOCIATION
Represented By: George Steven Isaacson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: ROXY HUBER, in her capacity as Executive Director, Colorado Department of Revenue
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.