Cambridge University Press, et al v. J. Albert, et al Featured Case

Is it Fair Use to make digital copies for e-reserves at a university, using the four factor analysis on an item by item basis? If so, how should the analysis be made?

Plaintiff - Appellant: CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, INC. and SAGE PUBLICATIONS, INC.
Defendant - Appellee: J. L. ALBERT, in his official capacity as Georgia State University Associate provost for Information Systems and Technology, KENNETH R. BERNARD, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of regents of the University System of Georgia, ROBERT F. HATCHER, in his official capacity as Vice Chair of the Board of Regents of the Univesity System of Georgia, W. MANSFIELD JENNINGS, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia and MARK P. BECKER
 
Case Number: 12-15147
Filed: October 5, 2012
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2014 72 Oral argument CD requested by Jack I. Lerner for American Association of University Professors; International Communication Association; Peter Decherney; Tsitsi Jaji; Society for Cinema and Media Studies; Modernist Studies Association in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
December 16, 2013 Oral Argument CD sent to Lindsey A. Harrison for Bondurant Mixson & Elmore. [12-14676, 12-15147]
December 16, 2013 70 Oral argument CD requested by Lindsey A. Harrison for Bondurant Mixson & Elmore. [12-14676, 12-15147]
December 13, 2013 69 Oral argument CD requested by Lindsey Harrison.
November 19, 2013 Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Robert Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
August 29, 2013 67 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 11/18/2013 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF.
August 29, 2013 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Tuesday, 11/19/2013 Argument Location: Atlanta Courtroom: Atlanta 339. [12-14676, 12-15147]
August 29, 2013 Attorney Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147 hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/19/2013. R. Bruce Rich (212) 310-8000 will present argument. [12-14676, 12-15147] (ECF: Edward Krugman)
July 2, 2013 64 Assigned to tentative calendar number 6 in Atlanta during the week of November 18, 2013. [12-12119, 12-12993, 12-14402, 12-11042, 12-14676, 12-15147, 12-13673, 12-15374, 12-15832, 12-11126, 11-12674, 12-15744, 12-14302]
May 30, 2013 Additional copies of expanded record excerpts received from Anthony B. Askew for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans in 12-14676 and forwarded to the record room. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 21, 2013 Supplemental Expanded Record Excerpts [1 VOLUMES - 5 sets] filed by Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. Service date: 05/20/2013 email - Attorney for Amicus Curium: Ablin, Chapman, Dove, Joseph, Lerner, Meloy, Pequignot, Rasenberger, Schultz, Steinman, Stoltz, Tonsager, Wasoff; Attorney for Appellants: Eskow, Krugman, Rains, Rich, Singer; Attorney for Appellees: Ashby, Askew, Bates, Gentry, Harbin, Levie, Miller, Quicker, Schaetzel, Whiting-Pack; Attorney for Not Party: Tenny; US mail - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Aistars; Attorney for Appellants: Bloom, Larson; Attorney for Appellees: Lynn, Moffitt, Volkert, Warenzak. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 21, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 16, 2013 Additional copies of expanded record excerpts received from John H. Rains, IV for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676 and forwarded to the record room. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 3, 2013 Corrections to brief received on 05/03/2013 from Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676, 12-15147. All deficiencies have been corrected. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 2, 2013 58 Notice of deficient Amicus brief filed by Attorney Jason Michael Schultz for Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676, 12-15147.Deficiencies: Missing the source of its authority to file. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 2, 2013 MOTION MOOT: Motion for leave to file amicus brief is MOOT [6776447-2] in 12-14676 due letter filed on 02/22/2013. Motion filed by Not Party USA in 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
May 1, 2013 56 Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 30, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Karyn Kay Ablin is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6856394-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 30, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Karyn Kay Ablin for Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676. [6856394-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Legal Scholars in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae American Association of University Professors; International Communication Association; Peter Decherney; Tsitsi Jaji; Society for Cinema and Media Studies; Modernist Studies Association in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 29, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Bruce Gary Joseph is GRANTED by Supervisor/ACN. [6854697-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae The Association of Southeastern Research Librabries, Inc. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research in Support of Affirmance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Bruce Gary Joseph for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Bruce Gary Joseph for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 26, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Ada Meloy for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Ada Meloy for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 25, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Karyn Kay Ablin for party(s) Association Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Karyn Kay Ablin for party(s) Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 25, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for extension to file reply brief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. is GRANTED. [6847781-2] in 12-14676 Reply brief due on 05/20/2013. RB [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 23, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Bruce Gary Joseph for Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, et al. in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6854697-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 22, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., Risa Palm and Nancy Seamans in 12-15147. [12-15147, 12-14676]
April 11, 2013 41 RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for extension to file reply brief [6840638-2], Motion for extension to file reply brief [6833867-2] received from Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Robert Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676 is returned unfiled. [12-14676, 12-15147]
April 3, 2013 MOTION for extension of time to file reply brief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6840638-1]
February 6, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 38 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Sandra Aistars for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, Attorney Ronald G. Dove Jr. for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, Attorney Lindsey Tonsager for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Ronald G. Dove, Jr. is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785236-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Lindsey Tonsager is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785218-2], ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Sandra Aistars is GRANTED by Supervisor. [6785204-2] in 12-14676 [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 5, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Mary Eleanor Rasenberger for party(s) Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association, in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Mary Eleanor Rasenberger for party(s) Amicus Curiae Text and Academic Authors Association, in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae The Association of American University Presses, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Amicus Curiae Copyright Alliance in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 4, 2013 Added Attorney(s) Sandra Aistars for party(s) Not Party Copyright Alliance, in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Sandra Aistars for party(s) Not Party Copyright Alliance, in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
February 1, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellee brief filed by Appellees Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr. is GRANTED. [6770774-2] in 12-14676 Appellees brief due on 04/18/2013. FMH [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Ronald G. Dove, Jr. for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785236-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Lindsey Tonsager for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785218-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 31, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Sandra Aistars for Copyright Alliance in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6785204-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 29, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Lois F. Wasoff is GRANTED by Supervisor/JPL. [6778254-2] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 29, 2013 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Lois F. Wasoff for Amicus Curium Marybeth Peters, Ralph Oman and Jon Baumgarten in 12-14676, 12-15147. [6778254-1] [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 Expanded Record Excerpts filed [31 VOLUMES - 2 sets] by Anthony B. Askew for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., R. Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676, Jonathan Bloom for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Lisa Royce Eskow for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Edward B. Krugman for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., R. Bruce Rich for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and Randi Wolkenbreit Singer for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-15147. Service date: 01/28/2013 US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Askew; Attorney for Appellees: Gentry, Levie, Schaetzel, Volkert. [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-14676. [12-14676, 12-15147]
January 28, 2013 24 Appellant's brief filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Service date: 01/28/2013 [12-15147] Attorney for Appellee: Askew - hand delivery; Attorney for Appellee: Harbin - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Quicker - US mail, clerk; Attorney for Appellee: Schaetzel - hand delivery; Attorney for Appellee: Volkert - hand delivery. (ECF: John Rains)
December 18, 2012 Public Communication: APPELLANT'S BRIEFS ARE DUE JANUARY 28, 2013 AND ALLOWED UP TO 18,000 WORDS - SEE ORDER FILED ON 12/18/12. [12-14676, 12-15147]
November 2, 2012 22 Letter confirming request for seven-day extension filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
November 1, 2012 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellants brief due on 11/21/2012 as to Appellant Cambridge University Press, et al
October 29, 2012 20 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katrina M. Quicker for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Katrina Quicker)
October 25, 2012 19 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by (ECF: John Rains)
October 25, 2012 18 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
October 19, 2012 17 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
October 19, 2012 16 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. and Appellees J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. The appellants brief and record excerpts are due on or before 11/14/2012.
October 18, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Lisa Royce Eskow for party(s) Appellant Oxford University Press, Inc. Appellant Cambridge University Press Appellant Sage Publications, Inc., in case 12-15147.
October 18, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney John H. Rains IV for Appellant Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-15147 processed.
October 18, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney R. Bruce Rich for Appellant Sage Publications, Inc. in 12-15147 processed.
October 18, 2012 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa R. Eskow for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and SAGE Publications, Inc. John H. Rains, IV for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. and R. Bruce Rich for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. (ECF: John Rains)
October 18, 2012 11 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney John H. Rains, IV for Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file.
October 17, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. in 12-15147, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Robert F. Hatcher in 12-15147, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr. in 12-15147, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee Mark P. Becker in 12-15147, Attorney Stephen M. Schaetzel for Appellee J. L. Albert in 12-15147 processed.
October 16, 2012 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen M. Schaetzel for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Stephen Schaetzel)
October 15, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Robin L. Gentry for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-15147.
October 15, 2012 E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellee Mark P. Becker in 12-15147 processed.
October 15, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Walter Hill Levie III for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-15147.
October 15, 2012 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robin L. Gentry for Appellees (ECF: Robin Gentry)
October 15, 2012 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony B. Askew for Mark P. Becker, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., Robert F. Hatcher and W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr.. (ECF: Anthony Askew)
October 15, 2012 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter Hill Levie, III for Appellee (ECF: Walter Levie)
October 9, 2012 Added Attorney(s) Anthony B. Askew for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-14676 Attorney(s) Anthony B. Askew for party(s) Appellee W. Mansfield Jennings Jr. Appellee Mark P. Becker Appellee J. L. Albert Appellee Robert F. Hatcher Appellee Kenneth R. Bernard Jr., in case 12-15147. [12-14676, 12-15147]
October 5, 2012 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. on 10/02/2012. Fee Status: Fee Paid.
Search for this case: Cambridge University Press, et al v. J. Albert, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: SAGE PUBLICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: J. L. ALBERT, in his official capacity as Georgia State University Associate provost for Information Systems and Technology
Represented By: Laura Elisabeth Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KENNETH R. BERNARD, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Laura Elisabeth Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ROBERT F. HATCHER, in his official capacity as Vice Chair of the Board of Regents of the Univesity System of Georgia
Represented By: Laura Elisabeth Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: W. MANSFIELD JENNINGS, JR., in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Laura Elisabeth Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MARK P. BECKER
Represented By: Laura Elisabeth Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]