The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Paul Dickson, Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Canadian Standard Association
Petitioner: Google, Inc.
Plaintiff - Respondent: Betty Miles, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild
 
Case Number: 12-2402
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 67 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 08/14/2012, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][979344] [12-2402]
November 21, 2012 63 ATTORNEY, Sanford P Dumain for Joseph Goulden Betty Miles The Authors Guild Jim Bouton, in case 12-2402 , [62], ADDED.[775170] [12-2402]
November 20, 2012 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 11/20/2012 by CM/ECF. [774814] [12-2402]
August 14, 2012 59 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[691320] [12-2402]
August 14, 2012 58 LEAVE TO APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 08/14/2012, GRANTED. The appeal docket number is 12-3200. [691318] [12-2402]
August 14, 2012 53 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/14/2012, to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, ISSUED.[690791] [12-2402]
August 2, 2012 48 Featured Case ORDER, dated 08/02/2012, denying the request filed by Petitioner Google, Inc., for opportunity to present oral argument, FILED.[680622] [12-2402]
July 28, 2012 43 LETTER, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[676606] [12-2402]
July 25, 2012 42 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[673515] [12-2402]
July 11, 2012 35 ATTORNEY, Randolph Daniel Moss for Google, Inc., in case 12-2402 , [33], ADDED.[660614] [12-2402]
July 11, 2012 34 CURED DEFECTIVE reply in support of petition for leave to appeal, [32], on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED.[660607] [12-2402]
July 11, 2012 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/11/2012 by CM/ECF. [660102] [12-2402]
July 11, 2012 32 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [25], on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/10/2012 by CM/ECF.[660074][32] [12-2402]
July 11, 2012 31 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply brief, [30], on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED.[660006] [12-2402]
July 10, 2012 30 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/10/2012 by CM/ECF. [659449] [12-2402]
July 9, 2012 29 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to respond [25] filed by Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. [658052][29] [12-2402]
July 6, 2012 25 MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/04/2012 by CM/ECF. [656512] [12-2402]
July 6, 2012 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for leave to respond, [19], on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED.[656048] [12-2402]
July 6, 2012 23 ATTORNEY, Joanne Elin Zack for Joseph Goulden Betty Miles The Authors Guild Jim Bouton, in case 12-2402 , [21], ADDED.[656038] [12-2402]
July 6, 2012 22 CURED DEFECTIVE notice of appearance as additional counsel [21], on behalf of Respondents Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED.[656037] [12-2402]
July 5, 2012 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [655162] [12-2402]
July 5, 2012 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [11], on behalf of Respondents Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED.[655063] [12-2402]
July 4, 2012 19 MOTION, for leave to respond, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/04/2012 by CM/ECF. [654740] [12-2402]
June 27, 2012 12 OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to appeal (FRCP 23(f)) [1], on behalf of Respondent Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 06/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [649397][12] [12-2402]
June 27, 2012 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 06/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [648747] [12-2402]
June 20, 2012 10 LETTER, on behalf of -- Association of American Publishers, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc. and The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/20/2012 by CM/ECF.[642832] [12-2402]
June 14, 2012 2 LETTER, dated 06/14/2012, on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/14/2012 by 3rd party.[638403] [12-2402]
June 14, 2012 1 MOTION, for leave to appeal (FRCP23(f)), on behalf of Petitioner Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/14/2012 by 3rd party.[638397] [12-2402]
Search for this case: The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearson Education, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Standard Association
Represented By: Bruce P. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent: Betty Miles, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent: Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent: Jim Bouton
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent: The Authors Guild
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]