Windsor v. United States of America Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee: Edith Schlain Windsor, In her Official capacity as Executor of the estate of Thea Clara Spyer
Defendant - Appellant: United States of America and Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives
Case Number: 12-2435
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Tax Suits

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 340 U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 02/04/2013, RECEIVED.[855242] [12-2335, 12-2435]
February 1, 2013 343 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED. (12/26/2012 request resent)[883873] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 31, 2013 338 E-CASE, with attached record [333], to Supreme Court, TRANSMITTED.[833020] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 22, 2013 345 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED. (Cooper & Kirk)[887325] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 22, 2013 342 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[883871] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 16, 2013 334 E-CASE, with attached Record [333], to Supreme Court, TRANSMITTED.[818367] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 15, 2013 333 U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 01/15/2013, RECEIVED.[817807] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 3, 2013 344 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[887321] [12-2335, 12-2435]
January 3, 2013 332 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 12/28/2012, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 12-785, RECEIVED.[807071] [12-2335, 12-2435]
December 26, 2012 341 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[883868] [12-2335, 12-2435]
December 11, 2012 329 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 12/07/2012, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 12-307, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is granted, RECEIVED.[792500] [12-2335, 12-2435]
December 5, 2012 328 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [323] filed by Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, by CFD, FILED. [787295][328] [12-2335, 12-2435]
November 29, 2012 323 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 11/29/2012 by CM/ECF. [782249] [12-2335, 12-2435]
November 29, 2012 322 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated October 18, 2012, by DJ. FILED.[781369] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 24, 2012 320 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 10/18/2012, by DJ. FILED.[755582] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 22, 2012 319 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 10/18/2012, by CJS . FILED.[753448] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 22, 2012 318 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[753425] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 22, 2012 316 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[753423] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 19, 2012 313 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 10/18/2012, by DJ, FILED.[751805] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 18, 2012 317 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[753424] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 18, 2012 315 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[753421] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 18, 2012 311 Featured Case OPINION, Dissenting, by judge CJS, FILED.[750122] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 18, 2012 310 Featured Case OPINION, Affirmed , by DJ, CJS, CFD, FILED.[750098] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 18, 2012 309 NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Steglich, ASSIGNED.[749976] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 11, 2012 306 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[748971] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 10, 2012 307 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[748988] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 4, 2012 305 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[748968] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 1, 2012 303 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[733911] [12-2335, 12-2435]
October 1, 2012 301 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[733908] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 28, 2012 302 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[733909] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 27, 2012 298 CASE, before DJ*, CJS, CFD, C.JJ., HEARD.[731297] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 24, 2012 300 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[733907] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 24, 2012 292 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [727983-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The American Academy of Pediatrics, The American Psychanalytic Association, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Psychological Association, The National Association of Social Workers and its New York City and State Chapters and The New York State Psychological Association in 12-2335, FILED.[727997] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 24, 2012 291 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, FILED. Service date 09/24/2012 by CM/ECF. [727851] [12-2435]
September 20, 2012 283 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, LETTERS, [724810-2], [724811-2], [724812-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, Change To Win and National Education Association in 12-2335, FILED.[725005] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 19, 2012 281 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,LETTERS, BRIEF, [724591-2], [724593-2], [724654-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations in 12-2335, FILED.[724693] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 19, 2012 280 **REVISED** ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[724423] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 18, 2012 272 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [723035-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Columbia Law School Sexuality & Gender Law Clinic in 12-2335, FILED.[723095] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 18, 2012 267 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [722396-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, The City of New York and The Council of the City of New York in 12-2335, FILED.[722464] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 265 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [722232-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2435, FILED.[722278] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 263 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [719692-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Columbia Law School Sexuality & Gender Law Clinic in 12-2335, FILED.[722044] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 262 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [721079-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2435, FILED.[722031] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 260 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTERS, [719557-2], [720923-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, The American Psychanalytic Association, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Psychological Association, The City of New York, The Council of the City of New York, The National Association of Social Workers and its New York City and State Chapters and The New York State Psychological Association in 12-2335, FILED.[721828] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 258 CURED DEFECTIVE [720728-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Peter Bardaglio et al in 12-2335, FILED.[721741] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 252 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [719681-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The American Academy of Pediatrics, The American Psychanalytic Association, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Psychological Association, The National Association of Social Workers and its New York City and State Chapters and The New York State Psychological Association in 12-2335, FILED.[721479] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 17, 2012 251 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [713654-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, Change To Win and National Education Association in 12-2335, FILED.[721372] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 14, 2012 245 MOTION ORDER, granting Services and Advocacy for Gay Lesbian et al motion for leave to file brief as amicus curiae, [714027-2] in 12-2335, FILED. [720510][245] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 14, 2012 244 MOTION ORDER, granting 23 family law historians motion to file amicus curiae brief [713667-2] in 12-2335, FILED. [720490][244] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 14, 2012 242 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, FILED. Service date 09/14/2012 by CM/ECF. [720441] [12-2435]
September 14, 2012 240 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 09/11/2012, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 12-307, RECEIVED.[719969] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 239 **REVISED**ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[719478] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 237 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [714225-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Columbia Law School Sexuality & Gender Law Clinic in 12-2335, FILED.[718645] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 234 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, FORM, [718103-2], [224], [718139-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Nancy Pelosi et al in 12-2335, FILED.[718553] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 233 ATTORNEY, Miriam R. Nemetz for Nancy Pelosi et al, in case 12-2335 , [718103-2], ADDED.[718526] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 232 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [717951-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Katharine Baker et al in 12-2335, FILED.[718489] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 231 ATTORNEY, Stuart Wesley Yothers for Central Conference of American Rabbis et al, in case 12-2335 , [198], ADDED.[718469] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 229 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [714169-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The American Academy of Pediatrics, The American Psychanalytic Association, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Psychological Association, The National Association of Social Workers and its New York City and State Chapters and The New York State Psychological Association in 12-2335, FILED.[718397] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 13, 2012 226 ATTORNEY, Laura W. Brill for Susan Appleton et al, in case 12-2335 , [191], ADDED.[718329] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 12, 2012 224 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of 145 Members of the United States of House of Representatives , FILED. Service date 09/12/2012 by CM/ECF. [718127] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/13/2012 by TW]
September 12, 2012 222 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, AMICUS BRIEF, [189], [194], [713415-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Nancy Pelosi et al in 12-2335, FILED.[717755] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 12, 2012 221 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [714209-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Katharine Baker et al in 12-2335, FILED.[717713] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 12, 2012 219 ATTORNEY, Matthew F. Damm for Katharine Baker et al, in case 12-2335 , [713105-2], ADDED.[717694] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 12, 2012 218 ATTORNEY, Amy Lucas for Katharine Baker et al, in case 12-2335 , [184], ADDED.[717693] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 12, 2012 217 ATTORNEY, Dimitri Portnoi for Katharine Baker et al, in case 12-2335 , [185], ADDED.[717688] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 11, 2012 213 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [187], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Asian American Justice Center et al in 12-2335, FILED.[716425] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 11, 2012 212 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [182], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Asian American Justice Center et al in 12-2335, FILED.[716420] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 11, 2012 211 ATTORNEY, Timothy S. Fisher for Asian American Justice Center et al, in case 12-2335 , [187], ADDED.[716417] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 11, 2012 208 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, [713389-2], [713667-2], on behalf of Movant Peter Bardaglio et al in 12-2335, FILED.[716268] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 11, 2012 205 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [716007-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, The City of New York and The Council of the City of New York in 12-2335, FILED.[716136] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/11/2012 by TW]
September 11, 2012 202 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,BRIEF, [713526-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, The City of New York and The Council of the City of New York in 12-2335, FILED.[715936] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 7, 2012 199 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Columbia Law School Sexuality and Gender Law Clinic , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [714224] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Anti-Defamation League, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Congregation Beit Simchat Torah, Bend the ARC, A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Hadassah, The Women's Zionist Organization of America, the Hindu American Foundation, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Japanese American Citizens League, National Council of Jewish Women, People for the American way Foundation, Union for Reform Judaism, Women's League for Conservatism Judaism, Women of Reform Judaism , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [714195] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 197 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The American Psychological Association, The American Academy of Pediatrics, The American Psychiatric Association, The American Psychoanalytic Association, The National Association of Social Workers and its New York City and State Chapters, The New York State Psychological Association , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [714160] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 196 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Society on Aging , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713698] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 195 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Professors of Family and Child Welfare Law Susan Appleton, Carlos Ball, Brian Bix, Cynthia Bowman, Naomi Cahn, Nancy Dowd, Joanna L. Grossman, Joan Heifetz Hollinger, Lisa Ikemoto, Melanie Jacobs, Courtney Joslin, Herma Hill Kay, Charles Kindregan, Kristine S. Knaplund, Maya Manian, Linda McClain, Anthony Miller, Martha L. Minow, Douglas Nejaime, Kermit Roosevelt, Laura A. Rosenbury, Shelly Saxer, Katharine Silbaugh, Michael S. Wald, and Barbara Bennett Woodhouse , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713692] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 194 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of 145 Members of the United States House of Representatives , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713689] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Bar Associations and Public interest and Legal Service Organizations , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713678] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 192 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations, Change to Win, National Education Association, FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713642] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 191 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Professors of Family and Child Welfare Law Susan Appleton, Carlos Ball, Brian Bix, Cynthia Bowman, Naomi Cahn, Marion Crain, Nancy Dowd, Joanna L. Grossman, Joan Heifetz Hollinger, Lisa Ikemoto, Melanie Jacobs, Courtney Joslin, Herma Hill Kay, Charles Kindregan, Kristine S. Knaplund, Maya Manian, Linda McClain, Anthony Miller, Martha L. Minow, Douglas Nejaime, Kermit Roosevelt, Laura A. Rosenbury, Shelly Saxer, Katharine Silbaugh, Michael S. Wald, and Barbara Bennett Woodhouse , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713637] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 190 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Historians Peter W. Bardaglio, Norma Basch, George Chauncey, Stephanie Coontz, Nancy F. Cott, Toby L. Ditz, Ariella Dubler, Laura F. Edwards, Estelle B. Freedman, Sarah Barringer Gordon, Michael Grossberg, Hendrik Hartog, Ellen Herman, Martha Hodes, Linda K. Kerber, Alice Kessler-Harris, Elaine Tyler May, Steven Minitz, Amy Dru Stanley, Barbara Young Welke , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713410] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 189 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of 145 Members of the United States House of Representatives , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713397] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/10/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 188 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Senior Citizens Law Center , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713332] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 187 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Asian American Justice Center, FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by US mail. [713321] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 186 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Family Law Professors , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713187] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 185 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Family Law Professors , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713158] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 7, 2012 184 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Family Law Professors , FILED. Service date 09/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [713149] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 6, 2012 182 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Asian American Justice Center, FILED. Service date 09/06/2012 by US mail. [712912] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 6, 2012 181 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. , FILED. Service date 09/06/2012 by CM/ECF. [712662] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 6, 2012 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The Partnership for New York City, FILED. Service date 09/06/2012 by CM/ECF. [712497] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/06/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/07/2012 by TW]
September 6, 2012 178 ATTORNEY, Stuart F. Delery for United States of America, in case 12-2435 Stuart F. Delery for United States of America, in case 12-2335 , [176], ADDED.[711764] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 5, 2012 177 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, City of New York, Michael R. Bloomberg, In his offical capacity as Mayor of the city of New York, Christine C. Quinn, In her official capacity as Speaker of the Council of the city of New York , FILED. Service date 09/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [711678] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/06/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/11/2012 by TW]
September 5, 2012 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 09/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [711654] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 4, 2012 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Services and Advocacy for Gay, Lesbian, Bisexual and Transgender Elders (SAGE), FILED. Service date 09/04/2012 by CM/ECF. [709635] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/04/2012 by TW]--[Edited 09/04/2012 by TW]
September 4, 2012 171 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [708888-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 12-2335, FILED.[709210] [12-2335, 12-2435]
September 4, 2012 170 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [708642-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 12-2335, FILED.[709208] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 09/06/2012 by TW]
August 31, 2012 168 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [166], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 12-2335, FILED.[708728] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 31, 2012 167 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [151], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington in 12-2335, FILED.[708712] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 31, 2012 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington , FILED. Service date 08/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [708650] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/31/2012 by TW]
August 31, 2012 165 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, FILED. Service date 08/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [708078] [12-2435]
August 29, 2012 162 MOTION ORDER, deferring motion to dismiss [668933-2] filed by Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, FILED. [705703][162] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 28, 2012 156 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [696992-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III and John Ashcroft in 12-2335, FILED.[704127] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 28, 2012 155 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [704045-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III and John Ashcroft in 12-2335, FILED.[704123] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 28, 2012 153 ATTORNEY, Helen L. Gilbert for United States of America, in case 12-2435 Helen L. Gilbert for United States of America, in case 12-2335 , [152], ADDED.[703899] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 27, 2012 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [703865] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 27, 2012 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Citizens for Responsibiltiy and Ethics in Washington FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [703075] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/27/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/27/2012 by TW]
August 23, 2012 148 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to adjourn oral argument [87] filed by Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, FILED. [701409][148] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 23, 2012 146 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTER, [701197-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III and John Ashcroft in 12-2335, FILED.[701329] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 23, 2012 145 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [701180-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women For America in 12-2335, FILED.[701190] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 23, 2012 143 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[700905] [12-2435]
August 23, 2012 142 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2012 by CM/ECF.[700863] [12-2435]
August 23, 2012 141 EXTRA PAPER COPIES, Joint Appendix, Volume 1, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2335, RECEIVED.[700792] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 22, 2012 137 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [118], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/22/2012 by CM/ECF.[700065][137] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 22, 2012 132 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [699727-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women For America in 12-2335, FILED.[699796] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 22, 2012 130 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [129], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women For America in 12-2335, FILED.[699781] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 22, 2012 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Concerned Women for America , FILED. Service date 08/22/2012 by CM/ECF. [699722] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/22/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/22/2012 by TW]
August 21, 2012 119 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [117], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. in 12-2335, FILED.[697744] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 118 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to adjourn oral argument [87], on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/20/2012 by CM/ECF. [697712][118] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Organization for Marriage , FILED. Service date 08/20/2012 by CM/ECF. [697579] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/21/2012 by TW]
August 20, 2012 116 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [697203-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. in 12-2335, FILED.[697373] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 115 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [114], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. in 12-2335, FILED.[697334] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. in 12-2335, FILED. Service date 08/20/2012 by CM/ECF. [697199] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 113 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [697102-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Virginia in 12-2335, FILED.[697115] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 112 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [696982-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Virginia in 12-2335, FILED.[697031] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 111 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [695974-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae The States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Virginia in 12-2335, FILED.[696894] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 110 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [695842-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III and John Ashcroft in 12-2335, FILED.[696873] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 109 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [695861-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women For America in 12-2335, FILED.[696853] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 108 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [695805-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Concerned Women For America in 12-2335, FILED.[696837] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 20, 2012 107 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [693738-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. in 12-2335, FILED.[696827] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 17, 2012 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American College of Pediatricians , FILED. Service date 08/17/2012 by CM/ECF. [696365] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]
August 17, 2012 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Frederick Douglass Foundation , FILED. Service date 08/17/2012 by CM/ECF. [696104] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]
August 17, 2012 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The States of Indiana, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Colorado, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Virginia FILED. Service date 08/17/2012 by CM/ECF. [695971] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]
August 17, 2012 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Former Attorneys General Edwin Meese III and John Ashcroft, FILED. Service date 08/17/2012 by CM/ECF. [695840] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/20/2012 by TW]
August 17, 2012 100 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[695283] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 17, 2012 99 CURED DEFECTIVE APPENDIX, [695237-2], [695244-2], on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[695278] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 17, 2012 98 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [694816-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[695136] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 17, 2012 97 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [694774-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[695128] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 16, 2012 93 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [689222-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, FILED.[694526] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 16, 2012 92 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, joint appendix, [689185-2], [689183-2], [689181-2], [689180-2], [689179-2], [689177-2], [689174-2], [689172-2], on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2335, FILED.[694494] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 16, 2012 91 CAPTION, designation corrected for party United States of America, AMENDED.[694464] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 15, 2012 88 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, [87], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[693128] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/16/2012 by TW]
August 15, 2012 87 MOTION, to adjourn oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/15/2012 by CM/ECF. [693084] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 15, 2012 86 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, [83], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[693006] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 15, 2012 85 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, FILED. Service date 08/15/2012 by CM/ECF. [692887] [12-2435]
August 15, 2012 84 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[692628] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 15, 2012 83 MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/15/2012 by CM/ECF. [692562] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 15, 2012 81 ATTORNEY, Mariko Hirose for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2435 Mariko Hirose for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2335 , [80], ADDED.[692352] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 14, 2012 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/14/2012 by CM/ECF. [691998] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 14, 2012 77 CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY TO OPPOSITION, [76], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[691126] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/16/2012 by TW]
August 14, 2012 76 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [67], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/14/2012 by CM/ECF.[691029][76] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 14, 2012 75 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply to opposition, [73], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[690919] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 14, 2012 74 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION TO, suspend oral argument, [71], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[690879] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/16/2012 by TW]
August 13, 2012 73 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [67], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/13/2012 by CM/ECF.[690562][73] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 13, 2012 71 MOTION TO, suspend oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 08/13/2012 by CM/ECF. [690355] [12-2335, 12-2435]--[Edited 08/13/2012 by TW]--[Edited 08/16/2012 by TW]
August 3, 2012 70 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/27/2012, SET.[682153] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 3, 2012 68 CURED DEFECTIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION: [66], [67], on behalf of United States of America in 12-2335, FILED.[681629] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 3, 2012 67 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to dismiss [668933-2], to dismiss [53], on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/02/2012 by CM/ECF. [681607][67] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 3, 2012 66 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, OPPOSITION TO MOTION , to dismiss, [63], on behalf of United States of America in 12-2335, FILED.[681507] [12-2335, 12-2435]
August 2, 2012 63 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to dismiss [668933-2], to dismiss [53], on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/02/2012 by CM/ECF. [681464][63] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 20, 2012 57 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, RECEIVED. Service date 07/20/2012 by CM/ECF.[669309] [12-2435]
July 19, 2012 53 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 07/19/2012 by CM/ECF. [668779] [12-2435]
July 18, 2012 51 U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 07/17/2012, RECEIVED.[667514] [12-2435, 12-2335]--[Edited 07/18/2012 by WD]
July 16, 2012 48 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, RECEIVED. Service date 07/16/2012 by CM/ECF.[664876] [12-2435]
July 3, 2012 43 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL: FORM, [37], [40], on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[654166] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 42 ATTORNEY, Rose Ann Saxe for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2435 Rose Ann Saxe for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2335 , [40], ADDED.[654160] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654152] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 39 ATTORNEY, James D. Esseks for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2435 James D. Esseks for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2335 , [37], ADDED.[654142] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654135] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654126] [12-2335, 12-2435]
July 3, 2012 36 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/24/2012, PROPOSED.[653911] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 28, 2012 34 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [33], [32], on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED.[650452] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 28, 2012 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 06/28/2012 by CM/ECF. [650322] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 28, 2012 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, 12-2435, FILED. Service date 06/28/2012 by CM/ECF. [650312] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 27, 2012 30 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[648253] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 27, 2012 29 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[648247] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 26, 2012 28 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 06/26/2012 by CM/ECF.[647806] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 26, 2012 27 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 06/26/2012 by CM/ECF.[647135] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 25, 2012 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor, FILED. Service date 06/25/2012 by CM/ECF.[646797] [12-2435]
June 25, 2012 23 FORM D, on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/25/2012 by CM/ECF.[646667] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 25, 2012 22 FORM C, on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/25/2012 by CM/ECF.[646665] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 25, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER, dated 06/25/2012, appeal will be dismissed effective 07/09/2012, unless Forms C and D are submitted, FILED. [645899] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 22, 2012 19 EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Appellant Brief due date as 08/10/2012;. Appellee Brief due date as 08/31/2012,. Appellant reply brief due date as 09/14/2012;, FILED.[644538] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 22, 2012 18 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal [635936-2] filed by Appellee Edith Schlain Windsor in 12-2335, by GEL, FILED. [644501][18] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 20, 2012 12 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to expedite appeal [635936-2], on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, FILED. Service date 06/20/2012 by US mail, CM/ECF, email. [642723][12] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 20, 2012 10 ATTORNEY, Jaren Janghorbani for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2335 , [642226-2], ADDED.[642300] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 20, 2012 9 ATTORNEY, Andrew Ehrlich for Edith Schlain Windsor, in case 12-2335 , [642211-2], ADDED.[642297] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 19, 2012 8 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives, informing Court of proposed due date 08/10/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 06/19/2012 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[641373] [12-2335, 12-2435]
June 15, 2012 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[640733] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 15, 2012 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/07/2012, RECEIVED.[640732] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 15, 2012 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/06/2012, RECEIVED.[640730] [12-2435, 12-2335]
June 15, 2012 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 12-2435, FILED. [640723] [12-2435, 12-2335]
Search for this case: Windsor v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Edith Schlain Windsor, In her Official capacity as Executor of the estate of Thea Clara Spyer
Represented By: Roberta Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Jay Singer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group of the United States House of Representatives
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]