Laurie Sternberg v. Comm Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: LAURIE STERNBERG
Defendant - Appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 10-4445
Filed: November 23, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2011 3010500134 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Thursday, 06/23/2011.
June 8, 2011 3010556547 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Thursday, 06/23/2011.
July 19, 2011 3010598212 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: HARDIMAN, GREENBERG, Circuit Juges and *POLLAK, District Judge. Total Pages: 17. Judge: POLLAK Authoring. *The Honorable Louis H. Pollak, Senior Judge of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, sitting by designation.
March 3, 2011 3110456796 Opinion or Order of the Court NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Laurie Sternberg regarding the appendix filed on 02/01/2011. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 03/08/2011.
July 19, 2011 3110598296 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District Court dated September 30, 2010, is hereby affiremd. All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this Court.
September 9, 2011 3110648687 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Laurie Sternberg v. Comm Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: LAURIE STERNBERG
Represented By: Agnes S. Wladyka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMM SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: John M. Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]