Cassandra Grogan v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: CASSANDRA GROGAN
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 11-2451
Filed: June 1, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2011 3010586202 Featured Case BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Cassandra Grogan due on or before 08/16/2011. Appendix due on or before 08/16/2011.
September 30, 2011 3010671785 Featured Case Calendared for Friday, 01/13/2012.
January 3, 2012 3010764734 Featured Case Submit Notification for Friday, 01/13/2012.
January 23, 2012 3010784639 Featured Case NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: MCKEE, Chief Judge, FUENTES and JORDAN, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 14. Judge: JORDAN Authoring.
August 17, 2011 3110628124 Featured Case NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellant Cassandra Grogan regarding the brief and/or appendix filed on 08/16/2011. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 08/22/2011.
January 23, 2012 3110784645 Featured Case JUDGMENT, Affirmed. All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this Court. The parties shall bear their own costs.
March 15, 2012 3110839708 Featured Case MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Cassandra Grogan v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CASSANDRA GROGAN
Represented By: Thomas P. Connelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Robert S. Drum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]