Gregory Schmidt v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: GREGORY SCOTT SCHMIDT
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 11-2499
Filed: June 3, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: R.S.I.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
February 24, 2012 Gregory Schmidt v. Commissioner Social Security

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2011 3010593072 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Gregory Scott Schmidt due on or before 08/22/2011. Appendix due on or before 08/22/2011.
September 30, 2011 3010671528 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Monday, 01/09/2012.
December 22, 2011 3010755737 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Monday, 01/09/2012.
February 24, 2012 3010817657 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SCIRICA, Authoring Judge, RENDELL and SMITH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 12.
February 24, 2012 3110817662 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant.
April 16, 2012 3110869460 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Gregory Schmidt v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: GREGORY SCOTT SCHMIDT
Represented By: Shawn P. McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Mark E. Morrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]