Mark Hagans v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: MARK HAGANS
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
 
Case Number: 11-2526
Filed: June 8, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
September 14, 2012 Summary Hagans v. Comm'r of Soc. Sec.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 3010577394 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Mark Hagans due on or before 08/08/2011. Appendix due on or before 08/08/2011.
September 19, 2011 3010657523 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Friday, 11/18/2011 in Newark, NJ.
November 2, 2011 3010706735 Opinion or Order of the Court Oral Argument Notification for 11/17/2011 in Newark, NJ.
December 29, 2011 3010761662 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S LETTER to counsel written at the direction of the Court, Counsel for the parties are directed to submit letter briefs of no longer then five pages by January 13, 2012 addressing what level of deference, if any, the Court should give to Acquiescence Ruling 92-2(6) (the "AR"). (Please see the attachment for more information.)
September 14, 2012 3011016793 Opinion or Order of the Court PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: FUENTES and CHAGARES, Circuit Judges and *POGUE, Chief Judge. Total Pages: 33. Judge: CHAGARES Authoring. *The Honorable Donald C. Pogue, Chief Judge, United States Court of International Trade, sitting by designation.
September 28, 2012 3011030334 Opinion or Order of the Court NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Mark Hagans requesting Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Petition for Rehearing or a timely replacement Petition which does not contain exhibits except for this Court's Judgment and Opinion and a certificate of service. Compliance due 10/01/2012.
November 6, 2012 3011068581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Clerk) as it appearing that a Motion to Amend Petition for Rehearing as well as a Petition for Rehearing are pending with the Court the Mandate issued on 11/05/2012 is hereby recalled.
February 28, 2013 3011180723 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S LETTER to counsel written at the direction of the Court. The appellee is directed to address the effect of issuance of Social Security Ruling 13-3p on this appeal. The appellee s letter brief shall not exceed ten (10) pages and shall be received by the Court by March 15, 2013. The appellant may submit a reply letter brief also not to exceed ten (10) pages and that reply, if any, shall be received by the Court by March 28, 2013. (Please see attached letter for more information.)
September 14, 2012 3111016796 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant.
November 5, 2012 3111065974 Opinion or Order of the Court MANDATE ISSUED, filed.
Search for this case: Mark Hagans v. Commissioner Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: MARK HAGANS
Represented By: Joel M. Solow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Sathy A. Oum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]