Jason Rimel v. Commissioner Social Security

Plaintiff - Appellant: JASON RIMEL
Defendant - Appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 12-2721
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: S.S.I.D.

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
March 28, 2013 Jason Rimel v. Commissioner Social Security

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 3011107196 Opinion or Order of the Court Calendared for Friday, 03/22/2013.
March 7, 2013 3011188575 Opinion or Order of the Court Submit Notification for Friday, 03/22/2013.
March 28, 2013 3011211775 Opinion or Order of the Court NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: MCKEE, Chief Judge, SMITH and GREENAWAY, JR., Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5. Judge: GREENAWAY JR. Authoring.--[Edited 03/28/2013 by JK to correct text]
August 8, 2012 3110980867 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jason Rimel due on or before 09/17/2012. Appendix due on or before 09/17/2012.
March 28, 2013 3111211778 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Each party to bear its own costs.
Search for this case: Jason Rimel v. Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: JASON RIMEL
Represented By: Gregory T. Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: COMMISSIONER SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Eric P. Kressman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.