Gary Sawyer, et al v. E I DuPont de Nemours & Co

Plaintiff - Appellant: GARY SAWYER, DOUG KEMPF, PETER BARNABA, SR., GEOFF RORREV, TIM GREGORY and ET AL
Defendant - Appellee: E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO
Case Number: 11-40454
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Negotiable instruments

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 20, 2012 Summary Sawyer, et al. v. E I DuPont de Nemours & Co
July 27, 2012 Summary Sawyer v. E I DuPont de Nemours & Co.
June 11, 2014 Gary Sawyer, et al v. E I DuPont de Nemours & Co

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2014 502660590 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [11-40454 Affirmed ] Judge: HRD , Judge: EBC , Judge: JWE Mandate pull date is 07/02/2014 [11-40454]
April 20, 2012 511830056 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [11-40454 Affirmed ] Judge: HRD , Judge: EBC , Judge: JWE Mandate pull date is 05/11/2012 [11-40454]
July 27, 2012 511936810 Opinion or Order of the Court NON DISPOSITIVE PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. Judge: HRD , Judge: EBC , Judge: JWE Stay Follow-up Due on 10/25/2012 Case 11-40454 placed in abeyance for certified questions in 3:06CV702 from the Southern District of Texas [11-40454]
Search for this case: Gary Sawyer, et al v. E I DuPont de Nemours & Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: GARY SAWYER
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: DOUG KEMPF
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: PETER BARNABA, SR.
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: GEOFF RORREV
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: TIM GREGORY
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: ET AL
Represented By: Wade Thomas Howard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO
Represented By: Russell Joe Manning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]