Tammy Bell v. Jon Thornburg

Plaintiff - Appellant: TAMMY BELMON BELL
Defendant - Appellee: JON C. THORNBURG
 
Case Number: 13-30155
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers' Liability

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
December 30, 2013 Summary Bell v. Thornburg
December 31, 2013 Tammy Bell v. Jon Thornburg
January 20, 2014 Tammy Bell v. Jon Thornburg
January 29, 2014 Tammy Bell v. Jon Thornburg

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2013 502485089 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [7534559-2] [13-30155]
January 29, 2014 512515198 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-30155 Affirmed] Judge: CES , Judge: CDK , Judge: ECP. Mandate pull date is 03/24/2014 [13-30155]
Search for this case: Tammy Bell v. Jon Thornburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: TAMMY BELMON BELL
Represented By: Malcolm Xerxes Larvadain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JON C. THORNBURG
Represented By: Robert J. David
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]