Carolyn Casterline v. OneWest Bank, F.S.B.

Plaintiff - Appellant: CAROLYN CASTERLINE
Defendant - Appellee: ONEWEST BANK, F.S.B.
 
Case Number: 13-40067
Filed: January 18, 2013
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable instruments

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
June 26, 2013 Carolyn Casterline v. OneWest Bank, F.S.B.
July 4, 2013 Carolyn Casterline v. OneWest Bank, F.S.B.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 512286557 Opinion or Order of the Court UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-40067 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: EBC , Judge: SAH Mandate pull date is 07/16/2013 [13-40067]
July 3, 2013 512296905 Opinion or Order of the Court UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-40067 Affirmed] Judge: CDK , Judge: EBC , Judge: SAH Mandate pull date is 07/16/2013 [13-40067]
Search for this case: Carolyn Casterline v. OneWest Bank, F.S.B.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: CAROLYN CASTERLINE
Represented By: Paul Aram Pilibosian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: ONEWEST BANK, F.S.B.
Represented By: Catherine L. Hanna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]