Flava Works, Inc v. Marques Rondale Gunter, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee: FLAVA WORKS, INC
Defendant - Appellant: MARQUES RONDALE GUNTER, doing business as, MY VIDSTER.COM and SALSAINDY, LLC
Case Number: 11-3190
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
August 2, 2012 Summary Flava Works, Inc v. Marques Rondale Gunter, et al

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 49 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/02/2012 Final Order with Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6422856-2] [6422856] [11-3190] (SP)
August 24, 2012 48 Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $614.50. No record to be returned. [48] [6422852] [11-3190] (SP)
August 16, 2012 47 Filed Bill of Costs by Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC in the amount of $619.50. [47] [6420809] [11-3190]--[Edited 08/16/2012 by FI]to reflect correct amount of $614.50. (Lenz, William)
August 2, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. Costs to the appellants. [46] [6417228] [11-3190] (AD)
August 2, 2012 45 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Posner. VACATED. Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and Diane P. Wood, Circuit Judge. [45] [6417153] [11-3190] (AD)
May 25, 2012 44 Case argued by Mr. Kevin C. May for Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC and Mr. Meanith Huon for Appellee Flava Works, Inc. [44] [6401060] [11-3190] (SK)
May 25, 2012 43 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and Diane P. Wood, Circuit Judge. [43] [6401051] [11-3190] (SK)
May 23, 2012 42 Argument reset for Friday, May 25, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [42] [6400295] [11-3190] (AB)
May 18, 2012 41 Attorney William J. Lenz for SalsaIndy, LLC and Marques Rondale Gunter in 11-3190 terminated and added Attorney(s) Kevin C. May for party(s) Appellant Marques Rondale Gunter Appellant SalsaIndy, LLC, in case 11-3190 per disclosure statement. Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kevin C. May for Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. [41] [6399222] [11-3190]--[Edited 05/18/2012 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (May, Kevin)
May 15, 2012 40 Received argument confirmation from Kevin C. May for Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. [40] [6397847] [11-3190] (Lenz, William)
April 25, 2012 39 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. Paper copies due on 05/03/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6393031][39] [11-3190] (LJ)
April 25, 2012 38 Submitted appellant reply brief by William J. Lenz for Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. [38] [6392832] [11-3190] (Lenz, William)
April 20, 2012 37 Received argument confirmation from Meanith Huon for Appellee Flava Works, Inc. [37] [6391478] [11-3190] (Huon, Meanith)
April 19, 2012 36 Argument set for Friday, May 25, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 20 minutes. [36] [6391015] [11-3190] (AB)
April 4, 2012 34 Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America by consent. Paper copies due on 04/13/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6388042] [11-3190] (SP)
April 4, 2012 33 Submitted brief by Robert H. Rotstein for amicus The Motion Picture Association of America, Inc.. Consent from all parties contained within brief. [33] [6387334] [11-3190] (Rotstein, Robert)
March 28, 2012 29 Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Flava Works, Inc. Paper copies due on 04/04/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6385103][29] [11-3190] (RT)
March 28, 2012 28 Submitted appellee brief by Meanith Huon for Appellee Flava Works, Inc. [28] [6385053] [11-3190] (Huon, Meanith)
December 13, 2011 20 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Public Knowledge and Electronic Frontier Foundation per order. Paper copies due on 12/20/2011. Electronically Transmitted. [6358897] [11-3190] (RS)
December 13, 2011 19 Re-Submitted brief by Julie P. Samuels for Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Leave granted by court order. [19] [6358855] [11-3190] (Samuels, Julie)
December 8, 2011 18 Re-Submitted brief by Julie P. Samuels for Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge. Leave granted by court order. [18] [6357972] [11-3190] (Samuels, Julie)
December 8, 2011 17 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Facebook Incorporated and Google Incorporated, per order. Paper copies due on 12/15/2011. Electronically Transmitted. [6357920] [11-3190] (RT)
November 23, 2011 12 Filed Appendix by Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. [12] [6354857] Paper copies due on 11/30/2011. [11-3190] (SP)
November 23, 2011 11 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. Paper copies due on 11/30/2011. Electronically Transmitted. [6354856][11] [11-3190] (SP)
November 23, 2011 10 Submitted appellant brief by William J. Lenz for Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. [10] [6354804] [11-3190] (Lenz, William)
October 11, 2011 7 Docketing statement filed by Appellants Marques Rondale Gunter and SalsaIndy, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [6344196] [11-3190] (Lenz, William)
Search for this case: Flava Works, Inc v. Marques Rondale Gunter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: FLAVA WORKS, INC
Represented By: Meanith Huon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: MARQUES RONDALE GUNTER, doing business as, MY VIDSTER.COM
Represented By: Gregory J. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: SALSAINDY, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J. Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.