USA v. 186,416.00 in US

Plaintiff - Appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Claimant - Appellant,: UNITED MEDICAL CAREGIVERS CLINIC
Defendant,: 186,416.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Amicus Curiae,: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CRIMINAL DEFENSE LAWYERS
 
Case Number: 07-56549
Filed: November 5, 2007
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
January 7, 2010 USA v. 186,416.00 in US
April 26, 2011 Summary USA v. 186,416.00 in US
July 17, 2013 USA V. 186,416.00 IN US

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 9025138413 Opinion or Order of the Court Filed Order for PUBLICATION (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, MARSHA S. BERZON and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) MOTION TO DISMISS DENIED; MOTION FOR FEE AWARD GRANTED; REFERRED TO THE APPELLATE COMMISSIONER. [8706773]
October 20, 2009 920091020 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
January 7, 2010 920100107 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion
Search for this case: USA v. 186,416.00 in US
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Steven Reuben Welk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant - appellant,: UNITED MEDICAL CAREGIVERS CLINIC
Represented By: Paul L. Gabbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: 186,416.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Represented By: No Appearance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CRIMINAL DEFENSE LAWYERS
Represented By: Eric Honig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]