Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY, SANDRA B. STIER, PAUL T. KATAMI and JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Intervenor-Plaintiff - Appellee,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California, EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California, MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics, LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health, PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda and DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Intervenor-Defendant,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH, GAIL J. KNIGHT, MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ, MARK A. JANSSON, PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponents of Proposition 8 and HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
Movant - Appellant,: COUNTY OF IMPERIAL, THE BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE COUNTY OF IMPERIAL and ISABEL VARGAS, In her official capacity as Deputy Clerk/Deputy Commissioner of Civil Marriages for the County of Imperial
 
Case Number: 10-16751
Filed: August 11, 2010
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:
Date FiledDescription
January 4, 2011 Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 82 Terminated Jesse Panuccio for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Gail J. Knight, Mark A. Jansson, Dennis Hollingsworth and Martin F. Gutierrez in 10-16751 [7878020] (TB)
August 31, 2011 81 Filed (ECF) - Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel re Jesse M. Panuccio. Date of service: 08/31/2011 [7877738] (CJC)
July 19, 2011 80 Terminated Sarah E. Piepmeier for Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry and Paul T. Katami in 10-16751 [7825156] (TB)
July 18, 2011 79 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel re Sarah E. Piepmeier, Esq. Date of service: 07/18/2011 [7824148] (TO)
May 19, 2011 78 Attorneys Kenneth C. Mennemeier Jr., Kenneth C. Mennemeier Jr. and Andrew W. Stroud in 10-16751 substituted by Attorneys Tamar Pachter, Tamar Pachter and Tamar Pachter in 10-16751 [7758360] (RY)
May 19, 2011 77 Terminated - Mark B. Horton in 10-16751 [7758350] (RY)
May 19, 2011 76 Entered appearance of Howard Backer per 5/19/2011 Notice of Appearance [75]. [7758333] (RY)
May 19, 2011 75 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tamar Pachter for Edmund G. Brown, Howard Backer, and Linette Scott. Date of service: 05/19/2011. [7757676]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct filers. 05/19/2011 by RY] (TP)
March 14, 2011 74 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial, Isabel Vargas and Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey reply to response (, ,motion to intervene). Date of service: 03/14/2011. [7680318] (RHT)
March 14, 2011 73 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial, Isabel Vargas and Intervenor - Pending Chuck Storey reply to response (,motion to intervene, ). Date of service: 03/14/2011. [7680316] (RHT)
March 7, 2011 72 Filed (ECF) Appellee City and County of San Francisco response opposing motion (,motion to intervene). Date of service: 03/07/2011. [7671622] (CV)
March 7, 2011 71 Filed (ECF) - Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal response supporting motion (,motion to intervene). Date of service: 03/07/2011. [7671359] (CJC)
March 7, 2011 70 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo response opposing motion (,motion to intervene). Date of service: 03/07/2011. [7670643] (TO)
March 1, 2011 69 COURT DOCKET UPDATE: Party substitution of new officials: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Governor of California; and KAMALA D. HARRIS, in her official capacity as Attorney General of California. [7664704] (RY)
February 25, 2011 68 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending County Clerk Chuck Storey. [7659966] (TB)
February 25, 2011 67 Filed (ECF) Chuck Storey Motion to intervene. Date of service: 02/25/2011. [7659627] --[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect the content of the filing. Resent NDA. 02/25/2011 by DB] (RHT)
January 4, 2011 66 Filed CONCURRENCE TO THE CERTIFICATION ORDER AND PER CURIAM OPINION for PUBLICATION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT) (See order for full text) [7599002] [10-16696, 10-16751] (RP)
January 4, 2011 65 Featured Case FILED PER CURIAM OPINION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) AFFIRMED; DISMISSED. The district court order denying the motion to intervene is AFFIRMED. Movants’ appeal of the district court order concerning the constitutionality of Proposition 8 is DISMISSED for lack of standing. The deadline for filing a petition for panel rehearing or rehearing en banc is hereby EXTENDED until the deadline for such petitions in No. 10-16696, which will be 14 days after an opinion is filed in that appeal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to stay the issuance of the mandate in this case until the mandate issues in No. 10- 16696. AFFIRMED in part; DISMISSED in part. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7598965] (RP)
December 6, 2010 64 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH. [7568604] (CB)
December 2, 2010 63 Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and N. RANDY SMITH) Plaintiffs-appellees and plaintiff-intervenor-appellee’s time within the second hour of oral argument is hereby reallocated pursuant to their jointly submitted letter of December 1, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7565125] [10-16696, 10-16751] (WL)
December 1, 2010 62 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [33] filed by Equality California. (Sent to panel) [7564392] (SD)
November 30, 2010 61 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Reuter’s is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562525] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 60 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . The Recorder is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562521] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 59 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . Rex Wockner (to include 25 LGRT Newspaper) is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562508] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 58 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera for the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. . Critical Images, Inc., is directed to contact Stephanie Mullen at smullen@ap.org concerning the Associated Press’ news media pooling guidelines. [7562502] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 30, 2010 57 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KXTV-News10 applied to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KXTV-NEWS10’s request to videotape for later broadcast and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7562213] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 56 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): ....... . Non-Party Media Coalition’s request to televise live, video for later broadcast, radio broadcast live, audio-record for later broadcast and Webcast live is GRANTED. The Non-Party Media Coalition’s request to photograph with still camera is GRANTED. The Associated Press will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application for photography with still camera. (See Order for full text)[7560738] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 55 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KGO Radio applied to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KGO-Radio’s request to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7560572] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 54 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):CBS Network News (including CBS Evening News, The Early Show, Sunday Morning and CBS Newspath) applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. CBS Network News’ (including CBS Evening News, The Early Show, Sunday Morning and CBS Newspath) request is GRANTED. [7559990] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 53 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KCBS Radio applied to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KCBS-Radio’s request to radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559610] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 52 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):ABC News applied to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast, the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. ABC News’ request to televise live, videotape for later broadcast, radio broadcast live and audio-record for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559596] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 51 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): ABC News applied to televise live and videotaped for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. ABC News’ request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7559576] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 29, 2010 50 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA):KTVU- Channel 2 News applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KTVU-Channel 2 News’ request to televise live is GRANTED. [7559504] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 26, 2010 49 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW): For purposes of clarification, these appeals are consolidated for oral argument. Treating plaintiffs’ counsel’s letter of November 17, 2010, as a motion to reconsider this Court’s Order of November 15, 2010, the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The argument shall remain divided into two hour-long sessions as provided in this Court’s previously issued Order, and the allocation of time within the first hour remains the same. Time within the second hour, concerning the merits, is reallocated as follows: 30 minutes for the Proponents, 20 minutes for the Perry plaintiffs-appellees, and 10 minutes for the plaintiff-intervenor-appellee City and County of San Francisco. Until December 1, 2010, however, the Court will entertain any suggestion submitted jointly by counsel on plaintiffs’ side to reallocate the time between plaintiffs-appellees and plaintiff-intervenor-appellee, and similarly, any jointly submitted request relating to the time allocated to defendants-intervenors-appellants and movants-appellants. [7558727] [10-16696, 10-16751] (KKW)
November 24, 2010 48 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas Correspondence: Regarding the Court's Order dated November 15, 2010. Date of service: 11/24/2010 [7558261]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF; resent NDA. 11/26/2010 by DB] (RHT)
November 23, 2010 47 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:WL): All pending motions for leave to file briefs amicus curiae are GRANTED. The clerk shall file the briefs. [7556905] (WL)
November 23, 2010 46 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Equality California. [7556497] (FT)
November 23, 2010 45 Filed (ECF) Equality California Motion for ruling on pending motion to become amicus. Date of service: 11/23/2010. [7556323]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of filing. 11/23/2010 by RY] (DCC)
November 23, 2010 44 COURT DELETED ENTRY PER FILER'S REQUEST: Filed in error. Correct entry: [45]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Equality California Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 11/23/2010. [7556279] (DCC)
November 23, 2010 43 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): KRON TV- Channel 4 News applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduld to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. KRON TV-Channel 4 News’ request to televise live is GRANTED. [7555471] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 19, 2010 42 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA): The California Channel applied to televise live and videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The California Channel's request to televise live and videotape for later broadcast is GRANTED. [7551850] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 17, 2010 41 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)C-SPAN applied to televise live the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, on December 6, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. C-SPAN's request to televise live is GRANTED. A maximum of two (2) video cameras will be permitted in the courtroom. C-SPAN will serve as the pool-feed for all media organizations that submit an application.[7549282] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PA)
November 15, 2010 40 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:KKW): The Court orders that oral argument in these appeals be conducted in the following manner: The argument shall be divided into two hour-long sessions, with a brief recess in between. In the first hour, the parties shall address each appellant’s standing and any other procedural matters that may properly be raised. In the second hour, the parties shall address the constitutionality of Proposition 8. During the first hour, the Hollingsworth defendants-intervenors-appellants (“Proponents”) shall first have 15 minutes, and the Imperial County movants-appellants shall next have 15 minutes in which to present their opening arguments regarding standing and other procedural issues. The Perry plaintiffs-appellees shall then have 30 minutes in which to respond. Any time reserved by either appellant may be used for rebuttal, but only one rebuttal argument may be made and that by either appellant. During the second hour, the Proponents shall first have 30 minutes to present their opening argument on the merits of the constitutional question. The Perry plaintiffs-appellees shall then have 15 minutes, and the plaintiff-intervenor-appellee City and County of San Francisco shall have the next 15 minutes, in which to respond. Any time reserved by the Proponents may be used for rebuttal. No later than November 24, 2010, the parties shall advise the Court of any objection they have to the allocation of time within each hour or of any reallocation of time within each hour that they wish to propose, by electronically filing letters with the Clerk of the Court. If any party wishes to give its full allotted time within either hour to an amicus curiae, it may request that the Court reallocate that time accordingly. Otherwise, no motions for leave to participate in oral argument by amici curiae will be entertained. [7545530] (KKW)
November 8, 2010 39 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [36] filed by County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas.(Sent to panel) [7539879] (SD)
November 2, 2010 38 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [36] submitted by County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7532332] (FT)
November 2, 2010 37 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:WL): Movants-Appellants’ motion for leave to exceed the page limitations is GRANTED. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a gray cover, accompanied by [7531510] (WL)
November 1, 2010 36 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas. Date of service: 11/01/2010. [7530604] (JLM)
November 1, 2010 35 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 11/01/2010. [7530603] (JLM)
October 25, 2010 33 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Equality California. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7522214] (DCC)
October 25, 2010 32 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [30] submitted by California Professors of Family Law is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7521767] (FT)
October 25, 2010 31 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending California Professors of Family Law. [7521764] (FT)
October 25, 2010 30 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by California Professors of Family Law. Date of service: 10/25/2010. [7521496] (MSW)
October 22, 2010 29 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [25] filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Sent to panel) [7521215] (SD)
October 21, 2010 28 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [25] submitted by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7517825] (FT)
October 21, 2010 27 Notice of Oral Argument on DECEMBER 6, 2010 Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Attention: The Notice of Docket Activity may not list your case number. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7517712] [10-16696, 10-16751] (AM)
October 21, 2010 26 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: 12/06/2010 10:00 AM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [7517596] [10-16696, 10-16751] (AM)
October 18, 2010 34 Filed Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volumes. [7527095] (PANEL) (FT)
October 18, 2010 25 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Date of service: 10/18/2010. [7513126] (TO)
September 30, 2010 24 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [16] filed by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence. [7493606] (SD)
September 28, 2010 23 Filed original and 7 copies of Pacific Justice Institute amicus brief of 18 pages. Served on 09/24/2010. [7492905] (FT)
September 28, 2010 22 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Pacific Justice Institute. [7492898] (FT)
September 28, 2010 21 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [8] filed by County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas. [7490865] (SD)
September 28, 2010 20 Terminated Gordon Bruce Burns for Arnold Schwarzenegger and Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 10-16751 [7489951] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PH)
September 28, 2010 19 Terminated Gordon Bruce Burns for Arnold Schwarzenegger and Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 10-16696 [7489942] [10-16696, 10-16751] (PH)
September 28, 2010 18 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [16] submitted by Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7489522] (FT)
September 28, 2010 17 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Center For Constitutional Jurisprudence. [7489520] (FT)
September 24, 2010 16 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7487161] (JCE)
September 23, 2010 15 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Correspondence: Plaintiffs-Appellees' Notice of Consent to the Filing of Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 09/23/2010 [7484360] (TO)
September 22, 2010 14 Filed (ECF) - Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight and ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal Correspondence: Notice of Consent to Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 09/22/2010 [7484159] (BWR)
September 22, 2010 13 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [8] submitted by County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7484140] (FT)
September 22, 2010 12 Added attorney Rosanne C. Baxter for Jeffrey J. Zarrillo Sandra B. Stier Kristin M. Perry Paul T. Katami [7483588] (JFF)
September 22, 2010 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rosanne C. Baxter for Appellees Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Date of service: 09/22/2010. [7483572] (RCB)
September 22, 2010 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee CCSF Correspondence: Appellee CCSF's Notice of Consent to the Filing of Amicus Curiae Briefs. Date of service: 09/22/2010 [7483538] (CV)
September 20, 2010 9 Filed Movants-Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas excerpts of record in 4 volumes. [7479906] (FT)
September 17, 2010 8 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas. Date of service: 09/17/2010. [7479050] (RHT)
September 16, 2010 7 Filed order MEDIATION (LJE): Based on a review of the Mediation Questionnaire, this case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel for any party interested in obtaining assistance from the court in pursuing settlement of the case on appeal or learning more about the Mediation Program is encouraged to contact the undersigned by fax (415) 355-8566. The communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. Counsel are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. [7476516] (WL)
August 24, 2010 6 Added attorney Tamar Pachter for Edmund G. Brown Jr. [7449886] (JFF)
August 24, 2010 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tamar Pachter for - Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. Date of service: 08/24/2010. [7449861] (TP)
August 18, 2010 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7445020] (JLM)
August 17, 2010 3 Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS and SIDNEY R. THOMAS) The court sua sponte expedites the briefing and hearing of this appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 2. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) (pertaining to grants of time extensions) shall not apply to this appeal. This appeal shall be calendared with case No. 10-16696 during the week of December 6, 2010, at The James R. Browning Courthouse in San Francisco, California. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. The opening brief is now due September 17, 2010. The answering brief is due October 18, 2010. The reply brief is due November 1, 2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. [7442047] (KD)
August 13, 2010 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants County of Imperial, The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Isabel Vargas Motion for miscellaneous relief [Joinder of Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Filed in Case No. 10-16696 on August 12, 2010]. Date of service: 08/13/2010. [7440113] (JLM)
August 11, 2010 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/18/2010. Transcript ordered by 09/09/2010. Transcript due 10/11/2010. Appellant County of Imperial, Appellant The Board of Supervisors of the County of Imperial and Appellant Isabel Vargas opening brief due 11/18/2010. Appellee City and County of San Francisco, Appellee Paul T. Katami, Appellee Kristin M. Perry, Appellee Sandra B. Stier and Appellee Jeffrey J. Zarrillo answering brief due 12/20/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7435701] (COURT UPDATE: Entry updated to reflect fees have been paid; resent notice)--[Edited 08/11/2010 by HH] (WF)
Search for this case: Kristin Perry, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: KRISTIN M. PERRY
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: SANDRA B. STIER
Represented By: Theodore Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: PAUL T. KATAMI
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: JEFFREY J. ZARRILLO
Represented By: David Boies
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-plaintiff - appellee,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, in his official capacity as Governor of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Attorney General of California
Represented By: Gordon Bruce Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: MARK B. HORTON, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Public Health & State Registrar of Vital Statistics
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: LINETTE SCOTT, in her official capacity as Deputy Director of Health Information & Strategic Planning for the California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Kenneth C. Mennemeier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: PATRICK O'CONNELL, in his official capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: DEAN C. LOGAN, in his official capacity as Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk for the County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Judy W. Whitehurst
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: DENNIS HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: GAIL J. KNIGHT
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: MARTIN F. GUTIERREZ
Represented By: James Andrew Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: MARK A. JANSSON
Represented By: Jesse Panuccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: PROTECTMARRIAGE.COM - YES ON 8, A PROJECT OF CALIFORNIA RENEWAL, as official proponents of Proposition 8
Represented By: Jesse Panuccio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor-defendant,: HAK-SHING WILLIAM TAM
Represented By: Terry L. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant - appellant,: COUNTY OF IMPERIAL
Represented By: Jennifer L. Monk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant - appellant,: THE BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF THE COUNTY OF IMPERIAL
Represented By: Jennifer L. Monk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant - appellant,: ISABEL VARGAS, In her official capacity as Deputy Clerk/Deputy Commissioner of Civil Marriages for the County of Imperial
Represented By: Jennifer L. Monk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]