Robyn Cohen, et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant,: ROBYN COHEN, SHANNON STOLLER, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, BRYAN SIGLOCK and DEBRA LEWIN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant - Appellee,: FACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation
 
Case Number: 11-17840
Filed: November 28, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 13 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LJ) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys’ fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court.[8313162] [11-17840, 12-16069] (WL)
September 5, 2012 14 Filed parties' stipulated motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal; dated on 8/31/2012 [8313318] [11-17840, 12-16069] (HH)
July 27, 2012 12 Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on August 3, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. [8266345] [11-17840, 12-16069] (WL)
June 27, 2012 11 Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On June 26, 2012, an in-person mediation conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. The court will initiate a further conference by telephone on July 5, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [8229523] [11-17840, 12-16069] (WL)
May 24, 2012 10 Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): Appeal no. 12-16069 is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. At the request of counsel, a further conference in appeal no. 11-17840 will be held in conjunction with appeal no. 12-16069 on June 1, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. Counsel are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further discussions prior to the next scheduled conference. [8191107] [11-17840, 12-16069] (WL)
March 30, 2012 9 Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): On March 14, 2012, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Lisa Jaye. This appeal is selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. An in-person mediation conference will be held on June 26, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., at the U.S. Court of Appeals, 95 Seventh Street, Suite 109, San Francisco, California [telephone (415) 355-7900]. Participants shall have full authority to negotiate and settle the case on any terms at the conference. Mediation statements of no more than 10 pages shall be submitted to the undersigned [fax no. (415) 355-8566] on or before June 20, 2012. Mediation statements shall contain brief statements of the following:......Mediation statements shall not be filed with the court. Mediation statements shall contain the addresses and telephone and fax numbers of all participants. Participants should plan to spend the entire day engaged in meaningful settlement discussions and come prepared with thoughtful solutions to this dispute. [8123167] (AF)
February 16, 2012 8 Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone settlement assessment conference, with counsel only, on March 14, 2012, at 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time to discuss whether this case is appropriate for participation in the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. [8071364] (WL)
February 14, 2012 7 Added attorney Jay M. Spillane for Debra Lewin Christopher Marshall Shannon Stoller Bryan Siglock Robyn Cohen, in case 11-17840. [8068366] (JFF)
February 14, 2012 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jay Matheson Spillane for Appellants Robyn Cohen, Debra Lewin, Christopher Marshall, Bryan Siglock and Shannon Stoller. Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8067953] (JMS)
February 14, 2012 5 Added attorney Aaron Martin Panner for Facebook, Inc. [8067687] (JFF)
February 14, 2012 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aaron Martin Panner for Appellee Facebook, Inc.. Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8067430] (AMP)
February 13, 2012 3 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [6]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alex M. Weingarten for Appellants Robyn Cohen, Debra Lewin, Christopher Marshall, Bryan Siglock and Shannon Stoller. Date of service: 02/13/2012. [8066733] (AMW)
November 28, 2011 2 Filed Appellants Robyn Cohen, Debra Lewin, Christopher Marshall, Bryan Siglock and Shannon Stoller Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 11/22/2011. [7979477] (GR)
November 28, 2011 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 12/23/2011. Transcript due 01/23/2012. Appellants Robyn Cohen, Debra Lewin, Christopher Marshall, Bryan Siglock, Shannon Stoller opening brief due 03/02/2012. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 04/02/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7979474] (GR)
Search for this case: Robyn Cohen, et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ROBYN COHEN
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: SHANNON STOLLER
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: BRYAN SIGLOCK
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: DEBRA LEWIN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: FACEBOOK, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Matthew D. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]