Benjamin Joffe, et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff - Respondent,: BENJAMIN JOFFE, LILLA MARIGZA, RICK BENITTI, BERTHA DAVIS, JASON TAYLOR, ERIC MYHRE, JOHN E. REDSTONE, MATTHEW BERLAGE, PATRICK KEYES, KARL H. SCHULZ, JAMES FAIRBANKS, AARON LINSKY, DEAN M. BASTILLA, VICKI VAN VALIN, JEFFREY COLMAN, RUSSELL CARTER, STEPHANIE CARTER and JENNIFER LOCSIN
Defendant - Petitioner,: GOOGLE INC.
 
Case Number: 11-80186
Filed: July 29, 2011
 
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
 
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 6 Filed order (SUSAN P. GRABER and JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON) Petitioner’s request for leave to file a reply is granted. The reply has been filed. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is granted. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). . [7930497] (KKW)
August 16, 2011 5 Filed (ECF) Petitioner Google Inc. Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Permission to Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b)]. Date of service: 08/16/2011. [7860673] (MHR)
August 16, 2011 4 Court correction: Attorney Michael Rubin in 11-80186 substituted by Attorney Michael Harrison Rubin in 11-80186. Terminated Attorney Michael Rubin (wrong attorney added). [7859202] (RY)
August 8, 2011 3 Filed (ECF) Respondents Dean M. Bastilla, Rick Benitti, Matthew Berlage, Russell Carter, Stephanie Carter, Jeffrey Colman, Bertha Davis, James Fairbanks, Benjamin Joffe, Patrick Keyes, Aaron Linsky, Jennifer Locsin, Lilla Marigza, Eric Myhre, John E. Redstone, Karl H. Schulz, Jason Taylor and Vicki Van Valin answer to 1292b petition. Date of service: 08/08/2011. [7848392] (EJC)
July 27, 2011 2 Filed Petitioner Google Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement. Served on 07/27/2011. [7837059] (HC)
July 27, 2011 1 FILED ON 07/27/2011 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 1292(b). SERVED ON 07/27/2011. (Corporate disclosure statement within petition). [7837054] (HC)
Search for this case: Benjamin Joffe, et al v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: BENJAMIN JOFFE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: LILLA MARIGZA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: RICK BENITTI
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: BERTHA DAVIS
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: JASON TAYLOR
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: ERIC MYHRE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: JOHN E. REDSTONE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: MATTHEW BERLAGE
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: PATRICK KEYES
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: KARL H. SCHULZ
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: JAMES FAIRBANKS
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: AARON LINSKY
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: DEAN M. BASTILLA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: VICKI VAN VALIN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: JEFFREY COLMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: RUSSELL CARTER
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: STEPHANIE CARTER
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - respondent,: JENNIFER LOCSIN
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - petitioner,: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]