Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. Featured Case

Case Number: 12-1506
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
July 6, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
July 19, 2012 Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
September 21, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
September 25, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
September 28, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
October 15, 2012 APPLE INC. V. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2012 25 Docketing Statement for the Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/20/2012 by email. [18307]
July 19, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER filed denying [21] motion to expedite appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/19/2012 by clerk. [18122]
July 19, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER filed denying [2] motion for emergency stay pending appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. By: Motions Panel (Per Curiam). Service: 07/19/2012 by clerk. [18121]
July 13, 2012 22 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion to expedite appeal [21] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1506. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17580]
July 13, 2012 21 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to expedite case. Response/Opposition due 07/26/2012. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17493]
July 13, 2012 20 Sealed or confidential document received [Reply Declaration of Kathleen M. Sullivan] (corresponding to Doc No. [19]) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, placed in vault. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17492]
July 13, 2012 19 REPLY of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to response filed by Appellee in 12-1506 , Doc. No [16]. Service: 07/13/2012 by email. [17491]
July 12, 2012 18 Letter from Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Regarding Intent to Submit Reply In Further Support Of Stay Motion. Service: 07/12/2012 by email. [17391]
July 12, 2012 17 Sealed or confidential document received [Opposition to Motion for Stay and accompanying Declaration] (corresponding to Doc No. [3]) for Appellee Apple Inc., placed in vault. Service: 07/12/2012 by US mail, email. [17378]
July 12, 2012 16 RESPONSE of Appellee Apple Inc. to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [2] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1506 , motion for other relief [2] filed by Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC in 12-1506. Service: 07/12/2012 by US mail, email. [17376]
July 11, 2012 15 Entry of appearance for Jennifer L. Taylor as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc.. Service: 07/11/2012 by email. [17348]
July 10, 2012 14 Docketing Statement for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17150]
July 10, 2012 13 Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17149]
July 10, 2012 12 Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 07/10/2012 by email. [17147]
July 9, 2012 11 Entry of appearance for William B. Adams as of counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/09/2012 by email. [16836]
July 6, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER filed requesting a response to [2] motion for emergency stay pending appeal, denying [2] motion for immediate stay filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Apple's response is due no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 12, 2012. By: Motions Panel. Service: 07/06/2012 by clerk. [16766]
July 6, 2012 9 Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16710]
July 6, 2012 8 Entry of appearance for Harold J. McElhinny as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16709]
July 6, 2012 7 Entry of appearance for Michael A. Jacobs as principal counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16708]
July 6, 2012 6 Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui as of counsel for Appellee Apple Inc. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16707]
July 6, 2012 5 Entry of appearance for Kathleen M. Sullivan as principal counsel for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16705]
July 6, 2012 4 Letter from Appellee Apple Inc. regarding Rule 8 motion filed by Samsung parties. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16702]
July 6, 2012 3 Sealed or confidential document received [Confidential motion for interim stay and stay of preliminary injunction pending appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [2]), (corresponding to Doc No. [2]) for Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, placed in vault. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16695]
July 6, 2012 2 MOTION of Appellants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for interim stay and an emergency stay of preliminary injunction pending appeal under Rule 8. [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/05/2012 by email. [16691]
July 6, 2012 1 Appeal docketed. [16689] Entry of Appearance due 07/20/2012. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/20/2012. Docketing Statement due 07/20/2012. Certified List due on 08/15/2012.
Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]