Integrated Technology Corp. v. Rudolph Technologies, Inc.

Case Number: 12-1593
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent Infringement (Fed. Question)

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
May 29, 2013 INTEGRATED TECHNOLOGY CORP. v. RUDOLPH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
November 4, 2013 Summary Integrated Tech. Corp. v. Rudolph Tech., Inc.
October 10, 2012 INTEGRATED TECHNOLOGY V. RUDOLPH TECHNOLOGIES
October 11, 2012 INTEGRATED TECHNOLOGY CORP. V. RUDOLPH TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search for this case: Integrated Technology Corp. v. Rudolph Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.