Bahrani v. Conagra, Inc., et al

Case Number: 1:2000cv01077
Filed: May 25, 2000
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Referring Judge: Patricia A. Coan
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Agriculture
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2008 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relator's 187 Emergency Motion for Sanctions For Discovery Abuse. ORDERED that Relator's request for entry of sanctions is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall locate all documents res ponsive to Relator's discovery requests and make such documents available to Relator's counsel by 2/26/2008. FURTHER ORDERED that Relator's request for extension of time to identify and produce copies of export certificates is GRANTED on or before 3/5/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/4/08.(sss, )
January 29, 2009 399 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2009. Granting in part and denying in part 388 Defendants' Motion to Strike Relator's Ninth Supplemental Discovery Responses, Request for Status Con ference and Renewed Motion In Limine Concerning Dr. Joyce Bowing, as specified. Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for 02/13/09 at 10:00 AM. Follow-up Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for 02/27/09 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Gwen Daniel.) (wjc, )
February 2, 2009 402 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 397 Relator's Motion to Enforce Court's Prior Order Prhibiting Ex Parte Contact Between Defense Counsel and the Court Appointed Expert, by Judge John L. Kane on 02/02/09.(wjc, )
February 17, 2009 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Scienter Standard by Judge John L. Kane on 02/17/09. (wjc, )
March 2, 2009 432 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 428 Relator's Request for Clarification and the Court's expectations regarding attempts to contact Dr. Gray clarified, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/02/09.(wjc, )
February 27, 2009 434 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane: Trial Preparation Conference held on 2/27/2009. Relator's 425 Motion to Strike Dr. Gray As An Expert Witness is denied. (Court Reporter Kara Spitler.) (wjc, )
March 5, 2009 439 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER admitting the exhibit re 429 Motion for Reconsideration of Admittance of Defendants' Exhibit K: Affidavit of Brad Schmeh, the ruling is reiterated; denying 430 Relator's Motion in Limine re Dr. John Gray, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/05/09.(wjc, )
March 6, 2009 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 440 Relator's Motion to Call Witness, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/06/09.(wjc, )
March 18, 2009 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 462 Relator's Motion to Provide Instruction in Response to Juror's Question of Law to the issue being re-raised upon further inquiry by the jury, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/18/09. (wjc, )
March 17, 2009 467 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions: Counsel for the parties shall retain custody of their respective exhibits and depositions until such time as all need for the exhibits and depositions has terminated and the time to appeal has expired or all appellate proceedings have been terminated plus 60 days, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/17/09. (wjc, )
March 19, 2009 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Judgment: Judgment shall enter in favor of Relator and against Defendants on five of Relator's 1000+ reverse false claims under 31 U.S.C. 3729(a)(7) for a total amount of damages and civil penalties of $27,822.50. Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendants and against Relator on his remaining 995+ reverse false claims under the FCA. Relator shall be entitled to statutory post-judgment interest on the damages and penalty award at the applicable federal rate. The parties shall bear their own costs, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/19/09. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(wjc, )
March 19, 2009 473 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER for Judgment: Judgment shall enter in favor of Relator and against Defendants on five of Relator's 1000+ reverse false claims under 31 U.S.C. 3729(a)(7) for a total amount of damages and civil penalties of $27,822.50. Judgmen t shall enter in favor of Defendants and against Relator on his remaining 995+ hide-based reverse false claims under the FCA, as well as on all of Relator's meat-based reverse false claims. Relator shall be entitled to statuory post-judgment interest on the damages and penalty award at the applicable federal rate. The parties shall bear their own costs, by Judge John L. Kane on 03/19/09. (wjc, )
April 1, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 475 Relator's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Counsel for Mr. Bahrani and counsel for the United States as Interested Party (Ms. Amanda Adams Rocque is currently of record in this case) shall, wit hin the next 10 days, meet and confer for the purpose of reaching informal resolution of the question of what amount of the $27,822.50, plus postjudgment interest, is allocable to Mr. Bahrani as Relator. Relator shall file a Status Report on the status of these negotiations on or before 4/15/09. Relator shall file its request for expenses, attorney fees and costs pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d)(2) by formal Motion on or before 4/20/09 accompanied by an affidavit of counsel itemizing t he amounts requested in the various categories as well as an affidavit from a disinterested expert attesting to the reasonableness of the expenses, costs and attorney fees requested, as well as the necessity of their expenditure for the recovery attained. Defendants response, with rebuttal affidavit(s), is due on or before 05/08/09, by Judge John L. Kane on 04/01/09.(wjc, )
July 29, 2009 525 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge: Relators 482 Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Costs and Expenses be GRANTED in part, pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d)(2), and that Relator be awarded expenses, attorneys fees and c osts in the amount of $9,274.16; Defendants 495 Cross Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs Relating to the Meats Portion of the Case be DENIED, pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d)(4) and 28 U.S.C. § 1927. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civi l Procedure 72, the parties shall have ten (10) days after service of this Recommendation to serve and file any written objections in order to obtain reconsideration by the District Judge to whom this case is assigned, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/29/09. (wjc, )
August 28, 2009 541 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 525 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON MOTION AND CROSS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS. The Court finds no error in the Recommendation. The Objections are overruled and the Recommendation is received, approved and adopted by the court in toto as its Order, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/28/09.(wjc, ) Modified on 8/28/2009 to create linkage (wjc, ).
December 20, 2010 552 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Tenth Circuit's directives in U.S. ex. rel. Bahrani v. ConAgra, Inc., 624 F.3d 1275 (10th Cir. 2010) Mandate. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of Defendants on Relator's hide export certificate claims. This case is, and remains, otherwise CLOSED, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/20/2010. (wjc, )
January 20, 2011 559 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment 554 (To Add Award of Costs). ORDERED that the Judgment on remand be amended to reflect an award of costs to Defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) by Judge John L. Kane on 01/20/11.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahrani v. Conagra, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]