Mitchell v. USA, et al

Case Number: 1:2003cv00387
Filed: March 5, 2003
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2007 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Conference set for 5/18/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe.Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/19/07. (pap, )
July 17, 2012 363 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen and/or Reinstate Case 359 is DENIED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/17/12.(pabsec)
October 17, 2012 366 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The 364 Motion for an Extension of Time of Thirty (30) Days is granted. The 365 Motion for Relief from Judgment and/or Reconsideration is granted. On or before 11/26/2012, plaintiff shall file a renewed motion to reopen the case. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/17/12.(mnfsl, )
August 23, 2013 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 369 Motion for Leave to File Already Lodged Renewed Motion to Reopen Case is granted. Plaintiff's 367 Renewed Motion to Reopen Case is denied. Plaintiff's 368 Motion for Sanctions and for a Protective Order to Issue is denied. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/23/13.(mnfsl, )
January 10, 2014 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 371 Motion for Relief from Judgment by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/10/14.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. USA, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]