Netquote Inc. v. Byrd Featured Case

Plaintiff NetQuote Inc. alleges that defendants submitted false and misleading information to plaintiff through plaintiff\'s website at www.netquote.com concerning real or fictitious persons who allegedly wish to receive price quotations from NetQuote\'s insurance affiliates on various forms of insurance, but who in reality do not wish to receive any such contact from NetQuote or NetQuote\'s insurance affiliates.

Additional Resources

Defendant: Brandon Byrd and Mostchoice.com, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Netquote Inc.
Counter Claimant: Mostchoice.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Netquote Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00630
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2007 100
MOTION to Reopen Depositions at Federal Courthouse by Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
November 13, 2007 102
MOTION to Seal Document Reply Brief and Exhibits by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix LR 7.1 Certificate, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan)
November 13, 2007 104 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 93 Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions, for Additional Time to Complete Written Discovery, and to Modify the Scheduling Order Accordingly. Defendant's request to extend discovery period is denied without prejudice. Defendant's request for leave to take additional depositions is denied. Defendant's request for additional time to complete written discovery is granted. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's requests by 12/13/07, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/13/07.(sss, )
November 15, 2007 107 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Defendant's 102 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Mostchoice's Motion for Additional Discovery. Defendant to provide Plaintiff with copies of all documents filed under seal by 11/19/07, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/15/07.(sss, )
November 16, 2007 108
RESPONSE to 98 Defendants' Objection to 97 Magistrate's Order Upholding Attorneys' Eyes Only Designation by Plaintiff Netquote Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perkins, Heather) (Modified on 11/19/2007 to clarify linkage) (pap2, ).
April 13, 2007 10
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 2 Complaint, 3 Amended Complaint, 4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 4 Exhibit B to Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 5 Exhibit C to Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 6 Exhibit D to Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 7 Exhibit E to Proposed Third Amended Complaint# 8 Exhibit F to Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Beall, Christopher)
November 20, 2007 110 Opinion or Order of the Court
OBJECTION to Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perkins, Heather)
November 21, 2007 111
MOTION for Reconsideration re 104 Order on Motion for Leave,, in light of timely filed Reply Brief by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc. and Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 11/23/2007 to add filer (sss, ).
November 21, 2007 112
MOTION to Modify or for Relief from Protective Order by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc. and Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Martin Fleischmann, # 2 Appendix LR 7.1 Certificate)(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 11/23/2007 to add filer (sss, ).
November 21, 2007 113
MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Motion to Modify or for Relief from Protecitve Order [Dt.# 112] by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc. and Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 11/23/2007 to add filer(sss, ).
November 26, 2007 120
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection to Appeal of Magistrate's Order filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
November 27, 2007 121
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaims by Counter Claimants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Mostchoice.com, Inc., Mostchoice.com, Inc., Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Williams, Daniel)
November 28, 2007 122 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying Defendants' 111 Motion for Reconsideration of Defendant's Motion for Additional Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/28/07.(sss, )
November 30, 2007 123 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER on Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order: Defendants' Objection 98 is overruled and the Magistrate Judge's Order 97 is affirmed. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 11/30/07.(sss, )
November 30, 2007 124
Renewed MOTION For Extension of Time to Obtain Non-Party Discovery, Identify a Rebuttal Expert, and Continue the Final Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Continuation of Main Document LR 7.1 Certificate)(Isenberg, Ryan)
November 30, 2007 125
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit "F" to Renewed Motion to Extend Time for Non-Party Discovery by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc. and Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 12/5/2007 to add filer (sss, ).
December 3, 2007 129
RESPONSE to Motion re 100 MOTION to Reopen Depositions at Federal Courthouse filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Deposition Excerpts Brandon Byrd, # 7 Deposition Excerpts Michael Andrew)(Isenberg, Ryan)
April 16, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Plantiff 10 Motion to Amend Complaint by 04/19/07 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/16/07.(jjh, )
December 3, 2007 130
MOTION to Seal Deposition Transcript Excerpt by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan)
December 6, 2007 136 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to file response to Defendants' 130 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Depositions by 12/14/07, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/07. (sss, )
December 6, 2007 137 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed 125 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Defendants' Renewed Motion for Additional Discovery. Clerk of Court directed to maintain under seal document found at 126 , by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/07.(sss, )
December 6, 2007 138
RESPONSE to Motion re 130 MOTION to Seal Deposition Transcript Excerpt filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
December 6, 2007 139
STIPULATION (Amended) of Dismissal of Counterclaims by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
April 16, 2007 13
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd, filed by Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Beall, Christopher)
December 7, 2007 140
RESPONSE to Motion re 124 Renewed MOTION For Extension of Time to Obtain Non-Party Discovery, Identify a Rebuttal Expert, and Continue the Final Pre-Trial Conference filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Williams, Daniel)
December 10, 2007 141 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed 130 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Connection with Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Depositions. Clerk of Court directed to maintain under seal document found at 131 , by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/07.(sss, )
December 11, 2007 142
RESPONSE to Motion re 112 MOTION to Modify or for Relief from Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2007 to seal Exhibits A and B pursuant to memo of 12/11/07. (sss, ).
December 11, 2007 144
MEMORANDUM to file: pursuant to Magistrate Judge Hegarty's chambers, exhibts A and B to Plaintiffs Response to Mostchoices Motion to Modify Protective Order, or For Relief from Protective Order have been sealed. (sss, )
December 11, 2007 145
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Filed as Attachments to NetQuote Response Brief Concerning Protective Order Under Seal by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
December 14, 2007 147 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed 145 Motion to File Attachments to Netquote Response Brief Concerning Protective Order Under Seal. Clerk directed to maintain under seal documents found at Dkt #142-2 and Dkt #142-3, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/07.(sss, )
December 14, 2007 148
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness, and Exhibits and Deposition Transcripts in support thereof by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan)
December 14, 2007 149
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of M. Levy, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Levy, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Levy, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Levy, # 5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Isenberg, Ryan)
April 17, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER dismissing as Moot Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim for Fraud Upon Which Relief can be Granted. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 04/17/07.(jjh, )
December 14, 2007 152
Exhibits in Support of 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 150 Sealed Document,,, 151 Sealed Document, Exhibit List (exhibits filed under seal) by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan)
December 17, 2007 156
REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION to Reopen Depositions at Federal Courthouse filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
December 18, 2007 157
MOTION for Summary Judgment on MostChoice's Counterclaim by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
December 18, 2007 158
BRIEF in Support re 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment on MostChoice's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Williams, Daniel)
December 19, 2007 159 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER Granting 113 Plaintiff, Defendants' MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Motion to Modify or for Relief from Protecitve Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under seal those documents found at doc #114.Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/07.(pap, )
April 23, 2007 15
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Netquote Inc.. Mostchoice.com, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2007, answer due 6/15/2007. (Beall, Christopher)
December 19, 2007 160 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting 148 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness, and Exhibits and Deposition Transcripts in support thereof. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under seal the documents found under docs #150, 151 and 152. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/07.(pap, )
December 19, 2007 161 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 100 MOTION to Reopen Depositions at Federal Courthouse, 124 Renewed MOTION For Extension of Time to Obtain Non-Party Discovery, Identify a Rebuttal Expert, and Continue the Final Pre-Trial Conference, 112 MOTION to Modify or for Relief from Protective Order : Oral Argument set for 12/28/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/19/07. (pap, )
December 21, 2007 162
REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION to Modify or for Relief from Protective Order filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
December 28, 2007 163
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2007. ORDERED: Plaintiff's 100 Motion to Reopen Depositions at Federal Courthouse is granted in part and denied in part. ORDERED: Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.'s 124 Motion for Additional Time to Obtain Non-Party Discovery, to Continue the Final Pre-Trial Conference, and to Identify a Rebuttal Expert Witness is granted in part and denied in part. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/08 is vacted and reset for 2/20/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ORDERED: Defendants' 112 Motion to Modify Protective Order, or For Relief from Protective Order is denied without prejudice. (Court Reporter FTR - Ellen Miller.) (sss, )
January 3, 2008 164
RESPONSE to Motion re 155 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 1-B, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Perkins, Heather)
January 3, 2008 165
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document NetQuote's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
January 7, 2008 169 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed 165 Motion to File Netquote's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits Under Seal. Clerk directed to maintain under seal documents found at Dkt. 166, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/08.(sss, )
May 4, 2007 16
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Eichenbaum, Rachel)
January 7, 2008 170
RESPONSE to Motion re 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment on MostChoice's Counterclaim filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Deposition Excerpts Martin Fleischmann, # 4 Deposition Excerpts Michael Levy)(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 1/8/2008 to correct filer (sss, ).
January 7, 2008 171
MOTION to Obtain Relief Pursuant to FRCP 56(f) by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit Ryan Isenberg, # 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 1/8/2008 to correct filer (sss, ).
January 10, 2008 173
Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 1/10/2008. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
January 18, 2008 176
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Reply Briefs and Exhibits in Connection with Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Seal)(Isenberg, Ryan)
May 7, 2007 17
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel David Williams on behalf of Netquote Inc. (Williams, Daniel)
January 18, 2008 180
Exhibits in Support of 155 MOTION to Exclude, 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply Brief Exhibts Filed Under Seal) by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan)
January 18, 2008 181
REPLY to Response to Motion re 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment on MostChoice's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
January 18, 2008 182
RESPONSE to Motion re 171 MOTION to Obtain Relief Pursuant to FRCP 56(f) filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Daniel) Modified on 1/23/2008 to remove system-generated duplicate text (sss, ).
January 23, 2008 188 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 176 Unopposed Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Clerk of Court directed to maintain under seal documents found under docs. 177, 178 and 179, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/23/08.(sss, )
January 23, 2008 189
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Report by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Isenberg, Ryan)
May 7, 2007 18
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David W. Stark on behalf of Netquote Inc. (Stark, David)
January 23, 2008 190
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Rebuttal Expert Report by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Isenberg, Ryan)
January 25, 2008 194 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 190 Unopposed Motion to File Rebuttal Expert Report Under Seal. Clerk of Court is directed to maintain under seal document found under doc. 191, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/25/08.(sss, )
January 31, 2008 196
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Relief Under FRCP 56(f) [Dkt. 171] by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc. (Isenberg, Ryan)
February 4, 2008 197 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER granting 189 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal Expert Report. Plaintiff is granted leave to file Surreply to Motion to Exclude on or before 2/22/08, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/08.(jmp, )
February 5, 2008 198
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Melvin L. Hewitt, Jr. by Ryan Lance Isenberg on behalf of Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd (Isenberg, Ryan)
February 12, 2008 199
Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B-Defendants' Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C-Joint Trial Exhibit List)(Perkins, Heather)
May 8, 2007 19
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beall, Christopher)
March 29, 2007 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Denver District Court, Case Number 2006CV11463. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt Number COX000280), filed by Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Verified Complaint# 2 Cover Sheet# 3 Mtn for Issuance# 4 Order Granting Mtn# 5 Mtn for Discovery# 6 Order Granting Mtn# 7 Verified Amended Complaint# 8 Mtn for 2nd Amend Cmplt# 9 Order Granting Mtn# 10 Second Amend Cmplt# 11 Summons# 12 Affidavit of Service# 13 Affidavit of Service# 14 Index# 15 Civil Cover Sheet # 16 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet # 17 Receipt)(llr, )
February 20, 2008 200
Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2008. Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2008. Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/21/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
February 22, 2008 201
SURREPLY re 155 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perkins, Heather)
February 25, 2008 202
MOTION for Leave to Take Preservation Depositions by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 2/26/2008 to remove Byrd as filer (sss, ).
February 29, 2008 206 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER re: 155 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Brandon Byrd, Mostchoice.com, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2008 at 09:30 AM is reschuled to 02:30 PM the same day in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/29/08. (jmp, )
March 3, 2008 207
RESPONSE to Motion re 202 MOTION for Leave to Take Preservation Depositions filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perkins, Heather)
March 5, 2008 208
REPLY to Response to Motion re 202 MOTION for Leave to Take Preservation Depositions filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
March 6, 2008 209 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER: The Minute Order dated February 29, 2008, is amended to clarify that the hearing on Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony [Docket #155] is an evidentiary hearing, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/06/08. (jmp, )
March 6, 2008 210 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 202 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Take Preservation Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/06/08.(jmp, )
March 20, 2008 212
Proposed Pretrial Order Revised by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Williams, Daniel)
March 21, 2008 213 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER Final pretrial conference and motions hearing set 3/21/08 at 2:30 p.m. is vacated. Counsel to conference together and call chambers by 3/25/08 to obtain alternate date, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/08. (gms, )
March 21, 2008 214 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 3/24/2008 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/08. (jmp, )
March 24, 2008 215
Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2008. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/26/2008 03:15 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Final Pretrial Order approved. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes (mehcd)
March 24, 2008 217 Opinion or Order of the Court
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Pending Motions, Discovery complete, estimated 10-20 day jury trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/24/08. (jmp, )
March 26, 2008 218 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/18/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge David M. Ebel. 9 day Jury Trial set for 10/6/2008 09:00 AM before Judge David M. Ebel. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 3/26/08. (jmp, )
March 26, 2008 219
Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/26/2008. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
May 8, 2007 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher P. Beall terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/08/07.(jjh, )
April 14, 2008 220
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2008. All documents in Plaintiffs white exhibit notebook are admitted for the purposes of this hearing only. The portion of the transcript relating to Defendants Exhibit 5 and questions regarding that document will be SEALED. The Court takes the motion under advisement. (Court Reporter FTR-Cathy Coomes.) (jmp, )
April 15, 2008 221
NOTICE of Associated Cases by Plaintiff Netquote Inc. (Williams, Daniel)
April 23, 2008 222
OBJECTIONS to Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(A)(3) by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
April 24, 2008 223
OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibits by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan)
April 29, 2008 224
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 155 Defendants' MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Brandon Byrd, Mostchoice.com, Inc. be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/28/08. (jmp, )
May 9, 2008 225 Opinion or Order of the Court
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 224 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Pages 94, 96 from Transcript)(Isenberg, Ryan)
May 13, 2008 228
OBJECTION to 224 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Pages from Transcript)(Isenberg, Ryan)
May 10, 2007 22
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
May 23, 2007 23
RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stark, David)
May 25, 2007 24
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
June 4, 2007 25
Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2007. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Confidential Settlement Statements due by 8/3/07. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
June 5, 2007 26 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/5/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2007. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2007 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/05/07. (jjh, )
June 6, 2007 27
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Isenberg, Ryan)
June 6, 2007 28
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
June 12, 2007 29
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order re Byrd computer hard drive by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
June 13, 2007 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 06/13/07.(jjh, )
June 15, 2007 32
Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Isenberg, Ryan)
April 1, 2009 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 306 Mostchoice's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Denying 312 Mostchoice's Motion for a New Trial or Remittitur. Granting in part and denying in part 305 NetQuote's Motion for Prejudgment Interest. Denying 305 NetQuote's Request for the Court to Exercise its Discretion to Increase Punitive Damages. Denying 333 Mostchoice's Supplemental Motion for New Trial based on false testimony. Defendants Brandon Byrd and Mostchoice shall jointly a nd severally pay to Plaintiff NetQuote: (a) actual damages in the amount of $1,600,000.00; (b) prejudgment interest in the amount of $24,168.00; (c) post-judgment interest on the sum of $1,624,168.00 at the applicable federal statutory post-judgment interest rate of.59% from the date judgment is entered. Defendant Mostchoice shall pay to Plaintiff NetQuote: (a) punitive damages in the amount of $1,624,168.00; (b) post-judgment interest on the sum of $1,624,168.00 a t the applicable federal statutory post-judgment interest rate of.59% from the date judgment is entered. Defendant Brandon Byrd shall pay to Plaintiff NetQuote: (a) punitive damages in the amount of $10,000.00; (b) post-judgment interest o n the sum of $10,000 at the applicable federal statutory post-judgment interest rate of.59% from the date judgment is entered. Judgment shall be entered accordingly in favor of Plaintiff NetQuote and against Defendants Brandon Byrd and Mostchoice, by Judge David M. Ebel on 4/1/09.(ebs, )
June 15, 2007 33
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Netquote Inc. by Mostchoice.com, Inc..(Isenberg, Ryan)
May 5, 2009 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(d), Court enters judgment against Brandon Byrd and MoistChoice, Com, Inc. and in favor of NetQuote, Inc. in the amount of $47,967.82 for all reasonable and necessary costs. Hearing on bill of costs set 5/6/09 is vacated, by Judge David M. Ebel on 5/5/09. (gmssl, )
June 15, 2007 34
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Brandon Byrd.(Isenberg, Ryan)
June 13, 2007 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER denying Stipulated 29 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/13/07.(gms, )
June 15, 2007 36
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
June 18, 2007 38
Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery Requests by Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Counter Defendant Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
June 19, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Stipulated 36 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/19/07.(jjh, )
June 19, 2007 41 Opinion or Order of the Court
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Search of Brandon Byrd's Computer Hard Drive. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/19/07. (jjh, )
June 19, 2007 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Joint 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery Requests by 07/13/07 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/19/07.(jjh, )
June 20, 2007 43
Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Counter Defendant Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Daniel)
June 20, 2007 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting Unopposed 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Counterclaim by 07/16/07. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 06/20/07.(jjh, )
June 20, 2007 45
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Local Counsel Teresa Ashmore and Rachel Eichenbaum, by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd, Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ashmore, Teresa)
June 20, 2007 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Teresa L. Ashmore and Rachel L. Eichenbaum terminated by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/20/07.(jjh, )
July 2, 2007 48
MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Counterclaims by Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Counter Defendant Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
July 13, 2007 49
MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Counter Defendant Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stark, David)
July 16, 2007 51
RESPONSE to Motion re 32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc., Counter Defendant Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Williams, Daniel)
July 23, 2007 52
RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
July 23, 2007 53
First MOTION for Leave to Amend Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Counterclaim# 2 Exhibit A to Amended Counterclaim)(Isenberg, Ryan)
July 26, 2007 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc's 53 Motion for Leave to amend counterclaims, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/26/07.(gms, )
July 27, 2007 56
RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B-1# 3 Exhibit B-2# 4 Exhibit B-3# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Levy)(Isenberg, Ryan)
July 27, 2007 57
REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
July 30, 2007 58
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 33 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Compliance with LR 7.1A# 2 Proposed Document Proposed Amended Counterclaim# 3 Exhibit A to Proposed Amended Counterclaim)(Isenberg, Ryan)
July 30, 2007 59
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Teresa Taylor Tate on behalf of Netquote Inc. (Tate, Teresa)
August 6, 2007 61 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 58 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. Defendant may re-file its amended pleading without the term "proposed" in the title, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/07.(lam, )
August 6, 2007 62
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Netquote Inc., filed by Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Isenberg, Ryan)
August 7, 2007 63
REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Counterclaims filed by Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Williams, Daniel)
August 7, 2007 64 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER dismissing as moot Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 08/07/07.(jjh, )
August 7, 2007 65
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 8/7/2007. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
August 13, 2007 66
REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
August 14, 2007 67 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER The parties are directed to contact this Courts chambers to reschedule a settlement conference when it appears that fruitful negotiations can occur by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/14/07. (jjh, )
August 15, 2007 68 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Defendant MostChoices Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. # 32) filed 06/15/07, is GRANTED as to Plaintiff NetQuotes claims of common law unfair competition and deceptive trade practices under the CCPA, and is DENIED as to any other basis for dismissal. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 08/15/07.(jjh, )
August 17, 2007 69
Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports by Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stark, David)
April 2, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Ebel. (jjh, )
August 20, 2007 71 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting in part and denying in part Unopposed 69 Motion for Extension of Time to submit Expert Report as set forth in this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/20/07.(jjh, )
August 23, 2007 73 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/23/07.(jjh, )
August 23, 2007 74 Opinion or Order of the Court
PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Documents and Deposition Transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/23/07. (jjh, )
August 23, 2007 75
MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Amended Fraud Counterclaim by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
August 23, 2007 76
REPLY to 62 Counterclaim by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Stark, David)
September 12, 2007 77
Second MOTION For Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports by Counter Defendants Netquote Inc., Netquote Inc., Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Stark, David)
September 14, 2007 79 Opinion or Order of the Court
Minute ORDER granting Second Unopposed 77 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Reports as set forth in this Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/14/07.(jjh, )
April 3, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2007 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty in Courtroom 203 on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2007. (mehcd)
September 14, 2007 80
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Amended Fraud Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Extend Time)(Isenberg, Ryan)
September 14, 2007 81 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by 09/21/07. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 09/14/07.(jjh, )
September 21, 2007 82
RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Amended Fraud Counterclaim filed by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
September 21, 2007 83
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Second Amended Counterclaim# 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Counterclaim# 3 Exhibit B of Proposed Counterclaim# 4 Exhibit C (redacted) to Proposed Counterclaim# 5 Exhibit D to Proposed Counterclaim# 6 Affidavit LR 7.1 Certificate)(Isenberg, Ryan)
September 26, 2007 86
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Netquote Inc. (Perkins, Heather)
September 26, 2007 87
Second COUNTERCLAIM (amended) against Netquote Inc.(a Colorado Corporation), filed by Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C - Redacted# 4 Exhibit D)(Isenberg, Ryan)
September 28, 2007 88
REPLY to 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaim, 75 MOTION to Dismiss MostChoice's Amended Fraud Counterclaim, 87 Counterclaim, 82 Response to Motion, 85 Order on Motion for Leave, in Support of Motion to Dismiss Fraud Counterclaim by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Tate, Teresa)
October 5, 2007 89 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER dismissing as Moot 75 Motion to Dismiss MostChoince's Amended Fraud Counterclaim. Signed by Judge David M. Ebel on 10/05/07.(jjh, )
April 4, 2007 8
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim for Fraud Upon Which Relief can be Granted by Defendant Brandon Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Eichenbaum, Rachel)
October 9, 2007 90
MOTION to Maintain Highly-Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only Designation for Documents by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Perkins, Heather)
October 9, 2007 91
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Netquote Inc..(Perkins, Heather)
October 18, 2007 93
MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions, to Extend Discovery, and Modify the Scheduling Order by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Continuation of Main Document LR 7.1 Certificate)(Isenberg, Ryan)
October 25, 2007 95
RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION to Maintain Highly-Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only Designation for Documents filed by Defendant Mostchoice.com, Inc.. (Isenberg, Ryan)
October 29, 2007 96
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Request for Admissions by Defendant Brandon Byrd. (Isenberg, Ryan)
October 31, 2007 97 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Maintain Highly Confidential - Attorneys Eyes Only Designation for Documents NQ000160- NQ000204. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/31/07.(sss, )
November 6, 2007 98 Opinion or Order of the Court
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 97 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Designation of Documents as Attorney Eyes Only by Defendants Mostchoice.com, Inc., Brandon Byrd (Isenberg, Ryan)
November 7, 2007 99
RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION for Leave to Take Additional Depositions, to Extend Discovery, and Modify the Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Netquote Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Stark, David)
April 12, 2007 9
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Lance Isenberg on behalf of Brandon Byrd (Isenberg, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netquote Inc. v. Byrd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Byrd
Represented By: Melvin L. Hewitt, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mostchoice.com, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin L. Hewitt, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Netquote Inc.
Represented By: David W. Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mostchoice.com, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Lance Isenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netquote Inc.
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]