Olson v. Golden, Colorado, City of, The et al

Plaintiff: Marian L. Olson
Defendant: Golden, Colorado, City of, The, Golden, Colorado, City Council for the City of, The and Campaign Election Board for the City of Golden, Colorado, The
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv01851
Filed: September 4, 2007
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2008 28 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/07/08.(jmp, )
September 7, 2007 2 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS. Any exhibits and depositions to be used during this case, counsel for the parties shall obtain such exhibits and depositions from the Court within 30 days after any judgment is entered or closure o f the case. Counsel shall retain same for 60 days beyondthe later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. Failure to retrieve exhibits and depositions in conformance with this Order may result in their destruction. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/7/07. (dln, )
September 11, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting set for 10/29/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 9/10/07. (dln, )
September 1, 2011 93 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/1/11. (msksec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olson v. Golden, Colorado, City of, The et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian L. Olson
Represented By: John Stuart Zakhem
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden, Colorado, City of, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden, Colorado, City Council for the City of, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campaign Election Board for the City of Golden, Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]