Dunlap v. Zavaras, et al

Petitioner: Nathan Dunlap
Respondent: Ari Zavaras and John W. Suthers
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00256
Filed: February 6, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/13. (nmmsl, ) Modified on 11/18/2013 to disregard this entry- this entry filed in incorrect case. (nmmsl, ).
January 14, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For the reasons set forth in the Motion and with the approvalof Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and consent of Judge Robert E. Blackburn, it is hereby the Clerk of the Court transfer Civil Action No. 06-cv-00611 to Judge Christine M. Arguello. Signed by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/14/2009.(sah, )
July 8, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 57 Respondents Motion to Strike ; Denying as moot 58 Applicants Motion for Leave by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/8/09.(erv, )
October 13, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDERDefendants are Ordered to file an Answer to Plaintiffs Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus 54 within 90 days of todays date. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/09/2009.(sah, )
August 24, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (CHUCK E. CHEESE) denying 54 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/24/2010. (wjc, )
September 10, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Petitioner's Application for Certificate of Appealability for his 6th claim for relief and denied for all other claims, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/10/10.(gmssl, )
October 6, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Respondent's Motion for Reconsideration, affirming 85 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Petitioner's Application for Certification of Appealability is GRANTED for his sixth claim for relief and DENIED for all other claims, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/06/2010.(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dunlap v. Zavaras, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Dunlap
Represented By: Philip Alan Cherner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ari Zavaras
Represented By: Paul Edward Koehler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Suthers
Represented By: Paul Edward Koehler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]