Bullock v. Freightliner, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Amy Bullock
Defendant: Freightliner, LLC and Penske Truck Leasing Company, L.P.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00491
Filed: March 10, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: Boulder
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Edward W. Nottingham
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2009 100 Featured Case Minute ORDER granting 98 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order With Respect to Endorsement of Rebuttal Expert Testimony. Plaintiffs shall designate rebuttal experts on or before March 25, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/12/09.(gmssl, )
May 19, 2009 123 Featured Case ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 106 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Court orders Plaintiff's Motion be granted as to Defendant Daimler and recommends Plaintiff's Motion be denied as to Defen dant Penske. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Third Amended Complaint consistent with this Order and Recommendation within three days of the District Court's order regarding this matter, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/19/09. (ebs, )
October 22, 2009 170 Featured Case ORDER Ten-Day Jury Trial set for 11/8/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/15/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/09. (ebs, )
March 29, 2010 224 Featured Case ORDER granting 131 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Objections. Accepting 123 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Granting in part and denying in part 106 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/10.(ebs, )
March 30, 2010 225 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against defendant Penske Truck Leasing Company are dismissed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/30/10.(ebs, )
June 1, 2010 242 Featured Case ORDER denying 227 Defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.'s Unopposed Motion to Direct Entry of Final Judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/1/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 268 Featured Case ORDER granting 173 Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of James Chinni Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 269 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 176 Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Jerry Ogden Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 270 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 174 Plaintiff Amy Bullock's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC's Expert Witness, Frank Entwisle, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 271 Featured Case ORDER denying 175 Plaintiff's Rule 702 Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Harry L. Smith, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 272 Featured Case ORDER denying 177 Plaintiff's Rule 702 Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Robert Butler, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 273 Featured Case ORDER denying 189 Defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC's Rule 702 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff Amy Bullock's Expert Witness, Michael McCort, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 274 Featured Case ORDER denying 190 Defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC's Rule 702 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff Amy Bullock's Expert Witness, Paul Lewis, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
September 30, 2010 275 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC's Rule 702 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Plaintiff Amy Bullock's Expert Witness, Dr. Stephen Batzer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/10.(ebs, )
October 20, 2010 313 Featured Case ORDER: Ten-Day Jury Trial reset for 10/17/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/7/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/20/10. (ebs, )
February 14, 2011 322 Featured Case ORDER THIS MATTER comes before the Court on reassignment to Judge William J. Martnez. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before February 23, 2011, a Joint Status Report, not to exceed 4 pages in length, exclusive of signature blocks. Status Report due by 2/23/2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2011. (erv, )
May 2, 2011 330 Featured Case ORDER denying 241 Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Exemplary Damages by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/2/2011.(erv, )
May 3, 2011 331 Featured Case ORDER that 317 Defendants motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks a pretrial evaluation and ruling regarding an admissibility issue. Defendants motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks a ruling that the MADYMO modeling analysis will be admissible as substantive evidence at trial. The MADYMO modeling analysis will not be admissible as substantive evidence at trial. by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/3/2011.(erv, )
June 23, 2011 338 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 336 the Motion for Withdrawal of Bryce D. Allen, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/23/2011. (mehcd)
September 14, 2011 348 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 346 the Joint Stipulated Motion to Request Order for Production of Autopsy Photographs and Request for Expedited Ruling, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/14/2011. (mehcd)
September 16, 2011 351 Featured Case ORDER granting 349 Joint Motion for Leave to File Trial Briefs. The parties Trial Briefs must be filed on or before September 30, 2011. by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/16/2011.(erv, )
September 28, 2011 365 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 344 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/28/2011.(erv, )
January 17, 2012 372 Featured Case ORDER. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/17/2012. (sah, )
March 14, 2012 406 Featured Case ORDER Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Designation of Deposition Testimony of Thomas Canfield, M.D. ECF No. 380 are SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART; Defendants Objections are sustained as to objections # 2 and 12. Plaintiff will not b e allowed to play for the jury the following portions of Dr. Thomas Canfields videotaped deposition: page 20, lines 6 through 12; and page 46, lines 15-18 (starting with I). (3) As to all other of Defendants Objections, the Objections are overruled, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/14/2012. (ervsl, )
March 27, 2012 418 Featured Case MINUTE ENTRY for Jury Trial - Day Seven held before Judge William J. Martinez on March 27, 2012. ORDERED: Defendant's Rule 50 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Product Defect Claim 416 is DENIED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. Defendant's Rule 50 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Plaintiff's Claim for Exemplary Damages 415 is GRANTED. Trial continued.(Court Reporter: Tamara Hoffschildt) (wjmcd, )
March 29, 2012 420 Featured Case Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Custody of Exhibits and/or Depositions by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/28/2012. (ervsl, )
January 15, 2009 85 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 83 the Joint Motion to Vacate and Reschedule the Settlement Conference. The Court construes this filing as a Motion to Convert the Settlement Conference to a Status Conference, therefore the Settlement Conference set in this m atter for Tuesday, January 20, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., is hereby converted to a Status Conference. At that time, the parties shall come prepared to discuss a revised Scheduling Order including the rescheduling of a Settlement Conference date. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/15/09.(erv, )
January 20, 2009 89 Featured Case Minute Entry/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/20/2009; granting 87 Defendant Freightlinger's Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Expert Witn ess Disclosures due by 2/25/2009, Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/11/2009, Discovery due by 6/5/2009, Dispositive Motions due by 6/19/2009, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2009, Confidential Settlement Statements due by 3/24/2009. Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, Settlement Conference set for 3/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Heg arty. Motions terminated: 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 29 Scheduling Order, 54 Order on Motion for Protective Order Extension of Defendant's Expert Deadlines and to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert McCort. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
February 12, 2009 91 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Domino's Pizza, LLC are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/12/09.(jjh, )
February 17, 2009 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 90 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Plaintiff-Intervenor Domino's Pizza and Defendant Freightliner, LLC. Each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/17/09.(jjh, )
February 17, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. The Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 47 is ACCEPTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 32 is granted in part and denied in part by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/17/09.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bullock v. Freightliner, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Bullock
Represented By: Michael John Thomson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightliner, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Company, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]