EPC Corporation et al v. Kreutzer et al

Plaintiff: EPC Corporation and Dennis C. Shaw
Defendant: James G. Kreutzer, Hermosa Park, LLC, Charles Shafer, II, Michael (I) McQuinn, Michael McQuinn, Barry Mason, Brandon Ropp, Bret Mason, Daniel Wanstrath, Diane Orrell-Lopez, Dylan Norton, Jackie Oney, Tony Oney, Janet Pettigrew, Leslie R. Farrell, Lois Carpenter, Matthew Spowart, McKown and McKown, LLC, MREI, LLC, R. Ken Carpenter, Robert Wallace, Ronald W. Pettigrew, Royal Lillge, Sultana Investment Limited Partnership, Thomas L. Grams, William Pease Family Limited Partnership and Thomas A. St. Ours
Case Number: 1:2008cv01463
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 105 , 108 , 113 and 116 motions, because of material factual disputes the motion of defendants for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2009.(rpmcd)
September 10, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2009 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only)on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/10/2009. (rpmcd)
September 10, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Consolidation. Ordered that civil actions are consilidated by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 09/10/09. (jjh, )
January 14, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 1/14/2010 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Herrmosa Park's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is denied. Motion to Strike Answer, Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint of H ermosa Park, LLC, filed October 2, 2009 123 , is granted. Motion to Disqualify Attorneys Christopher Hamilton, Esq. and DouglasBriggs, Esq. From Representing Hermosa Park, LLC, filed October 2, 2009 124 , is moot. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
March 1, 2010 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice re: 152 . ORDERED the complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Charles Shaffer II; Charles Charles Shaffer, II as Trustee for the Charles Shafer II Profit Sharing Plan and Trust; Michael McQuinn; Barr y Mason; Bret Mason; Daniel Wanstrath; Natalia Saprykina; Jackie Oney and Tony Oney, husband and wife; Sultana Investment Limited Partnership, Thomas L. Grams; Carl Rand; and William Pease Family Limited Partnership, an Alaska limited partnership, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/01/10. (jjh, ) Modified on 3/1/2010 to correct linkage (jjh, ).
March 1, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/30/2010 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 22, 2010, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/1/2010. (rpmcd)
March 1, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Dismissal re: 150 and 154 . ORDERED the complaint is dismissed as to Defendants Charles Shaffer II; Michael McQuinn; Michael McQuinn as Trustee for the Michael McQuinn Profit Sharing Plan; Barry Mason; Bret Mason; Daniel Wanstrath; Dian e Orrell-Lopez; Dylan Norton; Jackie Oney and Tony Oney, husband and wife; Janet L. Pettigrew as Trustee of the Janet L. Pettigrew Revocable Trust dated February 27, 2006; Leslie R. Farrell; Lois Carpenter; Matthew Spowart; McKown and McKown, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; MREI, LLC, an Alaskan limited liability company; R. Ken Carpenter; Robert Wallace; Ronald W. Pettigrew as Trustee of the Ronald W. Pettigrew Revocable Trust dated February 27, 2006; Royal Lillge; Sultana Investment Limited Partnership, an Alaska limited partnership; Thomas L. Grams; Thomas A. St. Ours; and William Pease Family Limited Partnership, an Alaska limited partnership, with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys fees. ORDERED that said defendants cross-claims against Defendants Hermosa Park, LLC,and James G. Kreutzer are dismissed without prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/01/10. (jjh, )
October 20, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Kreutzer's 164 Motion to Amend Answer, proceedings in this civil action are stayed pending final resolution of the state court litigation and finding as moot 165 , 167 , 169 and 176 Motions, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/20/2010.(rpmcd)
March 18, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Status Report due by 3/28/2011, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/18/2011. (rpmcd)
May 25, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Status Report re: 181 . Counsel shall submit a Status Report by 6/4/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/25/2012. (rpmcd )
July 31, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Status Report due by 8/8/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/31/2013. (rpmcd )
September 8, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to submit a Status Report by 9/19/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/8/14. (dkals, )
January 30, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Ordered that parties oral stipulation as to facts is approved and made an Order of Court. The parties stipate that Mr. Kreutzer signed Plaintiff's exhibit 6 in his ca pacity as manager for defendant Hermosa Park, LLC. Order Motion for Default Judgment taken under advisement 46 . Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2009. (Court Reporter Ellen Miller.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7) (jjh, )
February 6, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Recommendation Regarding Plaintiffs' 46 MOTION for Default Judgment. It is Recommended that Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against defendant Hermosa Park, LLC by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/06/09. (jjh, )
February 26, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Revoking Order of Reference and for Status Conference. Order that the Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Watanabe is vacated and Status Conference set for 3/17/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 02/26/09. (jjh, )
March 30, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Status Conference held on 3/30/2009 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: The September 24, 2008 28 Scheduling Order entered is vacated. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Ju dgment by Default Against Defendant Hermosa Park. LLC, filed March 16, 2009 88 , is denied. Counsel shall prepare an agreed scheduling order that addresses in clarity the parties' respective positions, succinctly states the claims, defenses an d counterclaims and if any discovery issues and submit it directly to chambers in paper format by 4:00 p.m., April 13, 2009. Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment by Default Against Defendant Hermosa Park. LLC, filed December 9, 2008 46 , is denied. Recommendation Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment by Default Against Defendant Hermosa Park. LLC, filed February 6, 2009 82 , is not adopted and denied. (Reporter FTR - K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
April 24, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Amend Answer, Counter-Claim and Cross Claim by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/24/09.(jjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPC Corporation et al v. Kreutzer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPC Corporation
Represented By: Jerome M. Joseph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis C. Shaw
Represented By: Jerome M. Joseph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Kreutzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermosa Park, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Shafer, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) McQuinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McQuinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Ropp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wanstrath
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Orrell-Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Norton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Oney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Oney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Pettigrew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie R. Farrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Spowart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKown and McKown, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MREI, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Ken Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Pettigrew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Lillge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sultana Investment Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Grams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pease Family Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. St. Ours
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]