Flint et al v. International Truck and Engine Corporation

Plaintiff: Jonathan (I) Flint and Jonathan Flint
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv01673
Filed: August 7, 2008
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: Routt
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATING AND WITHDRAWN MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/6/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/20/2009 VACATING AND WITHDRAWN (erv2, ).
May 6, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATING AND WITHDRAWN PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/6/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 5/20/2009 VACATING AND WITHDRAWN )(erv2, ).
May 11, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: granting 54 Motion for Leave to File Response and for Reconsideration of Courts Order Granting Defendants Motion for Protective Order; The Court vacates and withdraws its p revious Order granting Defendant Navistars Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Unigraphics System 50 Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2009 ; Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR / Cathy Coomes.) (erv, )
May 21, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2009, Held in ABEYANCE 38 Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Against the Defendant Navistar, or in the Alternative, To Com pel Discovery, for Sanctions, and to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines; The deadlines for designating expert disclosures are VACATED. granting in part and denying in part 41 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel; granting 50 Defendant Navistars Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Unigraphics System; (Court Reporter FTR / Linda Kahoe.) (erv, )
February 1, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/1/2010. (erv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flint et al v. International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan (I) Flint
Represented By: James Garrett Heckbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Flint
Represented By: James Garrett Heckbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]