Mulholland et al v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Edna Mulholland and Robert Mulholland
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc., Emich Oldsmobile, LLC, Emich Subaru West, LLC and Heuberger Motors, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv02148
Filed: October 3, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice (ORDER) of Dismissal of Emich Oldsmobile LLC d/b/a John Elway Subaru Only. Parties having filed a 32 Stipulation for Dismissal, the complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Emich Oldsmobile, LLC dba John Elway Subaru only, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/13/09. (gms, ) Modified on 1/14/2009 to create typographical error (gmssl, ).
February 9, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER granting 40 Motion to File Supplemental Brief, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/9/09.(gmssl, )
May 11, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants may have their costs, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/11/09.(gmssl, )
July 31, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Christine Stegehuis. Christine Stegehuis is relieved of any further representation of Heuberger Motors, Inc., by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/09.(gms, ) Modified on 8/4/2009 to correct spelling error(gms, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mulholland et al v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Mulholland
Represented By: Haydn Winston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mulholland
Represented By: Haydn Winston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emich Oldsmobile, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emich Subaru West, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heuberger Motors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]