State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. International Comfort Products, LLC et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: International Comfort Products, LLC and Von Weise, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv02301
Filed: October 23, 2008
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Presiding Judge: Zita L. Weinshienk
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 1/14/09.(gms, )
January 20, 2009 25 Featured Case ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/20/09. (gmssl, )
March 12, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER Settlement Conference reset for 5/13/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/09. (ebs, )
August 5, 2009 43 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Having considered the Stipulation of Dismissal, the stipulation is approved. All claims asserted against defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 8/5/09. (gms, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. International Comfort Products, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David Duane Piper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Comfort Products, LLC
Represented By: John 'Jay' D. McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von Weise, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]