Roueche et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Pagan Roueche, Pagan (I) Roueche, Hal William Roueche, Sr. and Hal (I) William Roueche, Sr.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00048
Filed: January 12, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 109 Featured Case NOTICE OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/18/10. (ebs, )
February 19, 2009 11 Featured Case Minute ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 4/16/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/19/09.(gmssl, )
January 27, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/27/09. (gms, )
January 7, 2010 45 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2010. Granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendants motion to strike certain experts designated by plaintiff or, in the alternative, motion for extension of time for defendant to designate corresponding experts. Discovery cut-off extended to 4/15/2010. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
January 7, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Certain Experts Designated By Plaintiff Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Extension Of Time For Defendant To Designate Corresponding Experts. Discovery due by 4/15/2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/7/10. (ebs, )
February 1, 2010 60 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2010. Taking under advisement 55 Unopposed Motion to Stay discovery pending ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss; (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
February 1, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER: denying 55 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/1/10.(bnbcd, ) Modified on 2/2/2010 to correct the signature date (ebs, ).
February 1, 2010 62 Featured Case ORDER :granting 40 Defendants Motion for Leave to Designate Hal WilliamRoueche, Jr., as a Non-Party at Fault, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/1/10.(bnbcd, )
March 1, 2010 75 Featured Case ORDER denying 65 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Stay of Discovery Or, In the Alternative, Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/1/10.(ebs, )
March 24, 2010 81 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: granting 79 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset FinalPretrial Conference. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2010. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/10/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Granting 79 Motion to Reset, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/24/10.(bnbcd, )
August 10, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDER denying 52 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(1), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment under Rule 56, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Finding by the Court under Rule 52, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/10/10.(ebs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roueche et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pagan Roueche
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pagan (I) Roueche
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal William Roueche, Sr.
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal (I) William Roueche, Sr.
Represented By: Frank W. Coppola
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]