Kail et al v. Whirlpool Corporation

Plaintiff: Joseph Kail and Patricia Kail
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00500
Filed: March 9, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/13/2009. The Protective Order is accepted for filing and is entered as an Order of the Court as of the date of this Minute Order.(klmcd) Modified on 7/15/2009 to correct filed date and text date (wjc, ).
July 10, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/10/2009. (klmcd)
August 25, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Extending Certain Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/15/2010. Settlement Conference set for 09/21/2009 at 1:30 PM is vacated and reset to 11/18/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/25/09. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(wjc, )
March 11, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/11/09. (mskcd)
March 11, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/7/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/11/09. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(wjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kail et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kail
Represented By: Kip Brian Shuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kail
Represented By: Kip Brian Shuman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]