Cellport Systems, Inc. v. Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG

Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv01007
Filed: April 30, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 102 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 61 With respect to Expert Witnesses, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/3/2010.(mjwcd)
October 13, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Amendments to Deposition of Alexander Sennecke as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/13/2010.(mjwcd)
May 14, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 05/14/09. (mskcd)
January 27, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 123 Defendant Peiker's Motion to Strike Cellport's Jury Demand, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/27/2011.(mjwcd)
March 4, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2011.Taking under advisement 133 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
March 4, 2011 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. That Defendant shall provide responses to items b., c., d., and e., to Plaintiff on or before 03/31/2011. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion as this court finds that an award of expenses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 under the circumstances and facts of this case would be unjust, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/04/2011.(wjc, )
August 24, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for In Camera Review. Documents set forth in the Order shall be delivered to Magistrate Judge Watanabe chambers before 8/31/2011. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/24/2011.(mjwcd)
August 31, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 172 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Mettenheimer Correspondence. Documents bates stamped PEIKER 025512, 025513 and 025515 through 025527, inclusive, and the English translation of the same shall be SEALED and not opened except by further Order of Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/31/2011.(wjc, )
January 25, 2012 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A ten-day Bench Trial is set 9/17/2012 at 9:00 a.m. and a Trial Preparation/Final Pretrial Conference is set 8/24/2012 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge R. Brooke Jackson in Courtroom A902, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/25/2012. (rbjsec. )
June 12, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Clarify. Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant has 20 days after the Court issues an Order on the Motion to Remand to answer or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/12/09.(wjc, )
February 6, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Denying as moot 116 Motion to Bifurcate. The Court's ruling on construction of the disputed portions of the Agreement, 117 is GRANTED. The 149 objection is DENIED, and the order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/6/12.(lsw, )
July 6, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant Peikers Motion for Further Ruling on Contract Interpretation as Matter of Law 202 is granted to the extent that, as requested, the Court has provided a further ruling on contract interpretation as a matter of law. However, the Court interprets the contract consistent with Cellports position regarding the territorial reach of the Agreement. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/6/2012.(sahsl, )
January 2, 2013 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT re: 254 Bench Trial - Completed, This case was tried to the Court on September 20-21, 24-25, 27-29, 2012 with final arguments given on November 29, 2012, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/2/2013. (ervsl, )
July 14, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia S. Krieger: Status Conference held on 7/14/2009. 13 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED. (Court Reporter Paul Zucerman) (mskcd)
July 16, 2013 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 273 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/16/13. (alvsl)
October 9, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: A Two-Tier Protective Order should enter in this case; The Stipulated Protective Order (docket no. 33 -2) is APPROVED and made an Order of Court. See signed written Stipulated Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/09/2009. (wjc, )
October 9, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/09/2009. (wjc, )
January 15, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/15/10. (msksec, )
May 1, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/01/2009. (sah, )
March 2, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Defendant Peiker's Motion to Reset Settlement Conference. Conference set 5/13/10 is vacated. Granting 76 Unopposed Motion to Amend Defendant Peiker's Answer and Counterclaims. Peiker's Amended Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims is accepted for filing. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/2/10.(gms, )
April 14, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Defendant's Motion to Amend Its Amended Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims. That the Defendants Second Amended Answer to the Amended Complaint and Counterclaims (docket no. 84 -1) is accepted for filing as of this date of this Order. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for the subject motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/14/2010.(wjc, )
May 11, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 16: In Court Hearing set for 7/14/2009 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/11/09. (msksec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cellport Systems, Inc. v. Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellport Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa A. Hogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peiker Acustic GMBH & Co. KG
Represented By: Christopher Hulbert Toll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]