Toni's Alpacas, Inc. v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Toni's Alpacas, Inc.
Defendant: Norman Evans and Prarie Legacy, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv02045
Filed: August 27, 2009
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Ouray
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2009 18 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/17/09. Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 10/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec, )
January 6, 2010 23 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiffs Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/06/2010.(sah, )
February 3, 2010 33 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/3/10. (cbssec)
March 9, 2010 35 Featured Case ORDER. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant, Prairie Legacy, LLC 34 filed 03/08/2010, is APPROVED. Plaintiffs claims against defendant, Prairie Legacy, LLC, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, Prairie Legacy, LLC, is DROPPED as a named party to this litigation, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/09/2010.(sah, )
September 4, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling Conference on 11/5/2009, at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/4/09. (cbssec )
August 30, 2010 62 Featured Case ORDER. The Stipulated Motion to Dismiss 61 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Lama Wellness Services, LLC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. Defendant, Lama Wellness Services, LLC is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/30/2010. (sah, )
September 16, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER. The Motion of Defendant Evans To Exclude Opinions of Dr. Johnson and Dr. Van Saun 50 filed 07/30/2010, is GRANTED. Defendant Evans Motion for Summary Judgment 53 filed 08/17/2010, is GRANTED. Defendant Evans Motion To Exclude Portions o f Testimony of Dr. Stachowski 51 filed 07/30/2010, is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs F.R.E. 702 Motion and Request for a Hearing Pursuant to F.R.E. 104 52 filed 07/30/2010, is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs claim of professional negligence against defe ndant is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Trial Preparation Conference, currently scheduled for 09/17/2010, at 1:30 p.m., as well as the trial, currently scheduled to commence on 10/04/2010, are VACATED. Judgment SHALL ENTER on behalf of defendant, Norman Evans, individually, against plaintiff, Tonis Alpacas, Inc., an Ohio corporation, as to all claims for relief and causes of action. Defendant is AWARDED his costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/16/2010.(sah, )
October 15, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER resetting hearing pursuant to an unopposed telephonic request made by counsel. ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference will be held on 11/16/2009, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/09. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Toni's Alpacas, Inc. v. Evans et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni's Alpacas, Inc.
Represented By: Earl G. Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prarie Legacy, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]