FORBA Holdings, LLC v. LICSAC, LLC et al

Plaintiff: FORBA Holdings, LLC
Defendant: LICSAC, LLC, DD Marketing, Inc., DeRose Management, LLC and LICSAC NY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv02305
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Conditional Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/10/2009.(wjc, )
December 14, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/09. (msksec, )
December 28, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. Clerk to randomly reassign the case to another judge, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/28/09. (gms, )
January 6, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2010.(erv, )
January 6, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/6/2010. (erv, )
January 11, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendants Motion to Dismiss. The Court, however, grants Plaintiff leave to file within 21 days an amended complaint that complies with the Twombly/Iqbal plausibility standard. If Plaintiff cannot, in good faith,4 file such a complaint, or if Plaintiff files nothing within 20 days, the case will be dismissed with prejudice. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/11/2010.(erv, )
February 26, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/26/2010. (erv, )
October 6, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/6/09. (mskcd)
October 20, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2009. (mjwcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORBA Holdings, LLC v. LICSAC, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORBA Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Dawes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LICSAC, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DD Marketing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeRose Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LICSAC NY, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]