Archangel Diamond Corporation et al v. OAO Lukoil

In Re: Archangel Diamond Corporation
Plaintiff: Archangel Diamond Corporation
Defendant: OAO Lukoil
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00229
Filed: February 3, 2010
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/17/2010. (sah, )
July 7, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff Archangel Diamond Corporations Motion for Withdrawal of Reference To Bankruptcy Court 1 filed 02/03/2010, is DENIED to the extent Archangel Diamond seeks withdrawal of the reference to the bankruptcy court of OAO Lukoils motion for remand and abstention, which currently is pending in the bankruptcy court. Plaintiff Archangel Diamond Corporations Motion for Withdrawal of Reference To Bankruptcy Court 1 filed 02/03/2010, is DENIED without prejudice to the extent Archangel Dia mond seeks withdrawal of the reference to the bankruptcy court of Archangel Diamonds lawsuit against OAO Lukoil, which case currently is pending before the bankruptcy court. If the bankruptcy court denies OAO Lukoils motion for remand and abstention, then Archangel Diamond may renew its motion for withdrawal of reference concerning Archangel Diamonds pending lawsuit against OAO Lukoil. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/07/2010.(sah, )
February 3, 2010 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference to the District Court, by Bk. Judge Howard R. Tallman on 2/3/10. (jak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Archangel Diamond Corporation et al v. OAO Lukoil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Archangel Diamond Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archangel Diamond Corporation
Represented By: Tucker K. Trautman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAO Lukoil
Represented By: Brent Ross Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]